Western National Mutual Insurance Company et al v. Inductotherm Corporation
Plaintiff: Western National Mutual Insurance Company, Kenneth Martinez and Patrick Maki
Defendant: Inductotherm Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00039
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 5/29/2020. Dispositive Motions due 4/9/2021. Settlement Letters due 7/30/2021. Motions in Limine due 8/6/2021. Responses due 8/20/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2021 at 4:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 9/13/2021 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/11/2020. (kwf)
March 6, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 3/6/2020 [:10] (skv)
February 28, 2020 Filing 11 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Avolio, Robert) Modified on 2/28/2020. (lak)
February 28, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Western National Mutual Insurance Company. (Kennedy, Kevin)
February 12, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Patrick Crooks for Defendant Inductotherm Corporation. (Crooks, Michael)
February 7, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Maria D. Sanders for Defendant Inductotherm Corporation. (Sanders, Maria)
February 4, 2020 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference reset at plaintiffs' request for 3/6/2020 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
January 27, 2020 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2020 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
January 24, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Inductotherm Corporation. (Avolio, Robert)
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Nicholas Morgan Gaunce for Defendant Inductotherm Corporation. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert Patrick Avolio for Defendant Inductotherm Corporation. (Avolio, Robert) Modified on 1/17/2020: E-mail sent to counsel. (lak)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert Patrick Avolio for Defendant Inductotherm Corporation. (Avolio, Robert)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 Notice by Defendant Inductotherm Corporation. Notice to Adverse Party of Notice of Removal. (Avolio, Robert) Modified on 1/17/2020: Appearance filed by Maria D. Sanders? (lak)
January 16, 2020 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
January 16, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Inductotherm Corporation. (Avolio, Robert)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Vilas County Circuit Court, case number 2019-cv-000161, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2610795), filed by Inductotherm Corporation, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Docket, #4 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Avolio, Robert) Modified on 1/15/2020. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western National Mutual Insurance Company et al v. Inductotherm Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inductotherm Corporation
Represented By: Robert Patrick Avolio
Represented By: Michael Patrick Crooks
Represented By: Nicholas Morgan Gaunce
Represented By: Maria D. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western National Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin James Kennedy
Represented By: Cory Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Maki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?