Bradley, Brandon v. Weber, Leigha et al
Plaintiff: Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. and Brittney Bradley
Defendant: Capt. Pitzen, Nurse Givens, Nurse Frank, Warden Novak, Lucas Weber, Leigha Weber, Sgt. Price, L. Alsum ODonovan, M. Glass, Bussie, Amber Davis, Dr. Kallas, Dr. Stange and Dr. Gambaro
Not Classified By Court: CCI Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2020cv00048
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Filing 36 Notice of Appearance filed by Laure C. Rakvic-Farr for Defendants Frank, Gambaro, Givens, Novak, Price, Leigha Weber, Lucas Weber. (Rakvic-Farr, Laure),(ps)
March 10, 2020 Filing 35 Acceptance of Service by DOJ on behalf of Defendants Frank, Gambaro, Givens, Novak, Price, Leigha Weber, Lucas Weber. (Held, Eliot),(ps)
March 10, 2020 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance filed by Eliot M. Held for Defendants Frank, Gambaro, Givens, Novak, Price, Leigha Weber, Lucas Weber. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Held, Eliot),(ps)
March 10, 2020 Filing 33 Declaration of Kelsey Stange, PSY.D filed by Defendants Frank, Gambaro, Givens, Novak, Price, Leigha Weber, Lucas Weber re: #4 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1004 - DAI 500.70.27) (Held, Eliot),(ps)
March 10, 2020 Filing 32 Declaration of Lucas Weber filed by Defendants Frank, Gambaro, Givens, Novak, Price, Leigha Weber, Lucas Weber re: #4 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1000 - Bed Assignments, #2 Exhibit 1001 - Inmate Status Changes, #3 Exhibit 1002 - DAI Policy 306.00.23) (Held, Eliot),(ps)
March 10, 2020 Filing 31 Brief in Opposition by Defendants Frank, Gambaro, Givens, Novak, Price, Leigha Weber, Lucas Weber re: #4 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Held, Eliot),(ps)
March 10, 2020 Set/Reset Briefing Deadlines as to #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff may have until 3/20/2020 to file a reply brief. (nln),(ps)
March 9, 2020 Filing 30 Declaration of Brandon D. Bradley that I will not be using any documents from HSU or PSU due to alterations of documents. (jef),(ps)
March 2, 2020 Filing 29 Request for Audit, by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (nln),(ps)
February 28, 2020 Filing 28 Letter from clerk's office regarding dkt. #27 illegible declaration from plaintiff. (jef),(ps)
February 28, 2020 Filing 27 Declaration of Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (jef),(ps) Clerk's office note, document scan is partly illegible. (jef)
February 27, 2020 Filing 26 Proposed Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (jef),(ps)
February 27, 2020 Filing 25 Motion for Leave to File and Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (jef),(ps)
February 27, 2020 Filing 24 Motion for an Order to get access to a pen and the law library 2-4 hours a week by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (jef),(ps)
February 27, 2020 Filing 23 Amended Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and TRO by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (jef),(ps)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff granted leave to proceed against Defendants Frank, Leigha Weber, Lucas Weber, Givens, Novak, Price, Gambaro. Leave to proceed denied and case dismissed against Amber Davis, M. Glass, Kallas, Pitzen, Stange, L. Alsum ODonovan and Bussie. Materials delivered to DOJ for acceptance of service. Defendants may have until March 10, 2020, to respond to Bradley's motion for a preliminary injunction, Dkt. #4 and Dkt. #4 -1. Once defendants submit their response, plaintiff may file a reply brief within 10 days. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 2/25/2020. (rks),(ps)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr., also known as Brittney Bradley, received a waiver of her initial partial filing fee. Dkt. #10 . But before she received notice of her waiver, she moved to dismiss this case because she could not afford the initial partial payment. Dkt. #12 . Because the payment had been waived, the court asked her to confirm whether she wished to withdraw her case. Dkt. #15 . She has since filed a "motion to proceed." Dkt. #19 . I understand this motion to mean that Bradley wishes to withdraw her motion to dismiss this case. So that motion, Dkt. #12 , is denied. I will screen Bradley's complaint in a future order. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 2/21/2020. (jef),(ps)
February 14, 2020 Filing 20 Letter from plaintiff requesting to go forward with cases 20-cv-48, 20-cv-49, 20-cv-50 and 20-cv-51. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
February 11, 2020 Filing 19 Motion to Proceed by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (jef),(ps)
February 11, 2020 Filing 18 Motion for Joinder by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (jef),(ps)
February 3, 2020 Filing 17 Letter from plaintiff Brandon Bradley dated 1/27/20 requesting to withdraw cases because filing fee is not being waived. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps)
February 3, 2020 Filing 15 Letter from Clerk's Office requesting confirmation from plaintiff that she still wishes to dismiss cases. (nln),(ps)
January 31, 2020 Filing 16 Motion of Indigent Status / Supplement to (11 in 3:20-cv-00050-jdp, 10 in 3:20-cv-00051-jdp, 10 in 3:20-cv-00049-jdp, 9 in 3:20-cv-00048-jdp) Motion to Waive Initial Partial Filing Fee filed by Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (jef),(ps)
January 31, 2020 Filing 14 Letter dated 1/27/2020 from plaintiff requesting to withdraw cases. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
January 31, 2020 Filing 13 Letter requesting complaint packet / Guide for Litigants Without a Lawyer by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) Clerk's office note, mailed a complaint packet per request. (jef)
January 29, 2020 Filing 12 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (nln),(ps)
January 28, 2020 Filing 11 Warden PLRA Letter. (nln),(ps)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr.'s motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee is GRANTED. Complaint taken under advisement for screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 1/28/2020. (nln),(ps)
January 24, 2020 Filing 9 Declaration of Indigency and Motion to Waive the Initial Partial Filing Fee, by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Page 1/Caption of Order) (nln),(ps)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The January 21, 2020 order entered in cases 20-cv-48, 20-cv-49, 20-cv-50 and 20-cv-51 is clarified to state that plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley Sr. is assessed $0.16 as initial partial payments of the $350.00 fees for each case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 1/24/2020. (jef),(ps)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 0.16 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 2/12/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 1/21/2020. (jef),(ps)
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/17/2020: #1 IPP Calculation) (jef).
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (jef),(ps)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 Declaration of Imminent Danger by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order to show cause for a preliminary injunction and TRO) (jef),(ps)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 Jurisdiction and Venue / Supplement to #1 Complaint filed by Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (jef),(ps)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 Supplemental Jurisdiction to #1 Complaint filed by Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (jef),(ps)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley, Brandon v. Weber, Leigha et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon D. Bradley, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittney Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Pitzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leigha Weber
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Alsum ODonovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bussie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Stange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Gambaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: CCI Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?