Bradley, Brandon v. Dane Co.Sheriff's Dept. et al
Plaintiff: Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. and Brittney Hardaway Bradley
Defendant: Nurses Jane/John Doe, Classification Jane Doe, Dep. Sheriff's John/Jane Doe, Dane Co.Sheriff's Dept., Sgts. John Doe and David Mahoney
Not Classified By Court: CCI Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2020cv00050
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Filing 24 Declaration of Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (nln),(ps)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr., also known as Brittney Bradley, has filed two identical complaints against defendants. No. 20-cv-50, Dkt. #1 (W.D. Wis. Jan. 16, 2020); No. 20-cv-126, Dkt. #1 (W.D. Wis. Feb. 10, 2020). In the '50 case, she was given a waiver of her initial partial filing fee. 20-cv-50, Dkt. #12 . But before she received notice of her waiver, she moved to dismiss the '50 case because she could not afford the initial partial payment. 20-cv-50, Dkt. #14 . Because the payment had been waived, the court asked her to confirm whether she wished to withdraw her case. 20-cv-50, Dkt. #17 . She has since filed a "motion to proceed" in the '50 case. 20-cv-50, Dkt. #21 . I understand this motion to mean that Bradley wishes to withdraw her motion to dismiss that case. So that motion, 20-cv-50, Dkt. #14 , is denied. I will screen Bradley's complaint in a future order. I will also dismiss the '126 case as unnecessary. Bradley will not be assessed a filing fee for the '126 case, nor will she be assessed a strike under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 2/21/2020. (jef),(ps)
February 14, 2020 Filing 22 Letter from plaintiff requesting to go forward with cases 20-cv-48, 20-cv-49, 20-cv-50 and 20-cv-51. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
February 11, 2020 Filing 21 Motion to Proceed by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (jef),(ps)
February 11, 2020 Filing 20 Motion for Joinder by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (jef),(ps)
February 3, 2020 Filing 19 Letter from plaintiff Brandon Bradley dated 1/27/20 requesting to withdraw cases because filing fee is not being waived. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps)
February 3, 2020 Filing 17 Letter from Clerk's Office requesting confirmation from plaintiff that she still wishes to dismiss cases. (nln),(ps)
January 31, 2020 Filing 18 Motion of Indigent Status / Supplement to (11 in 3:20-cv-00050-jdp, 10 in 3:20-cv-00051-jdp, 10 in 3:20-cv-00049-jdp, 9 in 3:20-cv-00048-jdp) Motion to Waive Initial Partial Filing Fee filed by Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (jef),(ps)
January 31, 2020 Filing 16 Letter dated 1/27/2020 from plaintiff requesting to withdraw cases. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
January 31, 2020 Filing 15 Letter requesting complaint packet / Guide for Litigants Without a Lawyer by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) Clerk's office note, mailed a complaint packet per request. (jef)
January 29, 2020 Filing 14 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (nln),(ps)
January 28, 2020 Filing 13 Warden PLRA Letter. (nln),(ps)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr.'s motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee is GRANTED. Complaint taken under advisement for screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 1/28/2020. (nln),(ps)
January 24, 2020 Filing 11 Declaration of Indigency and Motion to Waive the Initial Partial Filing Fee, by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Page 1/Caption of Order) (nln),(ps)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The January 21, 2020 order entered in cases 20-cv-48, 20-cv-49, 20-cv-50 and 20-cv-51 is clarified to state that plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley Sr. is assessed $0.16 as initial partial payments of the $350.00 fees for each case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 1/24/2020. (jef),(ps)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 0.16 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 2/12/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 1/21/2020. (jef),(ps)
January 16, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and TRO by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (jef),(ps)
January 16, 2020 Filing 7 Supplemental Jurisdiction re: Complaint filed by Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (jef),(ps)
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (jef),(ps)
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (jef),(ps)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (jef),(ps)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 Jurisdiction and Venue re: #1 Complaint filed by Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (jef),(ps) Note, the caption matches case 20-cv-49; however, the dates of the claims match the complaint in this case. (jef)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 Disregard; re-docketed at dkt. #7 . (jef).
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley, Brandon v. Dane Co.Sheriff's Dept. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon D. Bradley, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittney Hardaway Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurses Jane/John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classification Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dep. Sheriff's John/Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane Co.Sheriff's Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgts. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: CCI Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?