Xiong, Brian v. Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System
Plaintiff: Dr. Brian V. Xiong
Defendant: Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System
Case Number: 3:2020cv00242
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Anne Maryse Bensky for Defendant Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System. (Bensky, Anne)
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Rachel Lee Bachhuber for Defendant Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System. (Bachhuber, Rachel)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System. Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System waiver sent on 4/9/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Fairweather, Nicholas)
April 21, 2020 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System. Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System waiver sent on 4/14/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Fairweather, Nicholas) Modified on 4/22/2020: E-mail sent to counsel. Waiver sent 4/9/2020, not 4/14/2020. (lak)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System. (voc)
March 18, 2020 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
March 18, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2647185.), filed by Brian V. Xiong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Fairweather, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xiong, Brian v. Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Brian V. Xiong
Represented By: Nicholas E. Fairweather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System
Represented By: Anne Maryse Bensky
Represented By: Rachel Lee Bachhuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?