Quincy Bioscience, LLC v. Get Fit Fast Supplements LLC et al
Plaintiff: Quincy Bioscience, LLC
Defendant: Adam Harper, 601 N. Congress Ave, LLC and Get Fit Fast Supplements LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00253
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2020 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER, COUNTERCLAIM against Plaintiff Quincy Bioscience, LLC by Defendants Get Fit Fast Supplements LLC, 601 N. Congress Ave., LLC, Adam Harper. (Cahen, Geoffrey) Modified on 5/5/2020. (lak)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Defendants' answer due 5/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/21/2020. (jls)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #5 Motion to Admit Geoffrey Cahen Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/21/2020. (lak)
April 21, 2020 Filing 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Defendants 601 N. Congress Ave, LLC, Get Fit Fast Supplements LLC, Adam Harper. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Cahen, Geoffrey)
April 21, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Geoffrey Cahen for Defendants 601 N. Congress Ave, LLC, Get Fit Fast Supplements LLC, Adam Harper. (Cahen, Geoffrey)
April 21, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to Admit Geoffrey Cahen Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2665043.) by Defendants 601 N. Congress Ave, LLC, Get Fit Fast Supplements LLC, Adam Harper. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Cahen, Geoffrey)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Quincy Bioscience, LLC. (Karnik, Sanjay)
March 23, 2020 Filing 3 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (jls)
March 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to 601 N. Congress Ave, LLC, Get Fit Fast Supplements LLC, and Adam Harper. (jls)
March 23, 2020 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
March 23, 2020 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Related case 18-cv-875-jdp. (jls)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 TRADEMARK COMPLAINT Complaint for Unjust Enrichment, Trademark Infringement and Related Claims against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 26OB5D61.) TRADEMARKS AT ISSUE: Trademark # 3,349,744, issued 12/04/07, held by Quincy Bioscience, LLC ;, filed by Quincy Bioscience, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - PREVAGEN Trademark Registration, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons for Signature by Clerk: Defendant Get Fit Fast Supplements LLC, #4 Summons for Signature by Clerk: Defendant 601 N. Congress Ave, LLC, #5 Summons for Signature by Clerk: Defendant Adam Harper) (Karnik, Sanjay) Modified on 3/19/2020: Deleted addresses of all parties. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quincy Bioscience, LLC v. Get Fit Fast Supplements LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Harper
Represented By: Geoffrey Cahen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 601 N. Congress Ave, LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey Cahen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Get Fit Fast Supplements LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey Cahen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quincy Bioscience, LLC
Represented By: Sanjay Satish Karnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?