Martin, Kristoffer v. EatStreet Inc
Plaintiff: Kristoffer Martin and Karen Felde
Defendant: EatStreet Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00279
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 34 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings to Conduct Mediation by Plaintiffs Karen Felde, Kristoffer Martin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Maynard, Timothy)
May 22, 2020 Filing 33 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiffs Karen Felde, Kristoffer Martin Notice of Filing Consent to Join Lawsuit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent form for Opt-in Plaintiffs D. Allen and M. Kante) (Johnson, Larry)
May 21, 2020 Filing 32 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiffs Karen Felde, Kristoffer Martin Notice of Filing Consent to Join Lawsuit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent form for Opt-in Plaintiff Z. Lengani) (Johnson, Larry)
May 20, 2020 Filing 31 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiffs Karen Felde, Kristoffer Martin Notice of Filing Consent to Join Lawsuit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent Form for Opt-in Plaintiffs I. Dorcenat and J. Nsimba) (Johnson, Larry)
May 19, 2020 Filing 30 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiffs Karen Felde, Kristoffer Martin Notice of Filing Consent to Join Lawsuit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent form for Opt-in Plaintiffs T. Jackson and C. Washington) (Johnson, Larry)
May 18, 2020 Filing 29 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiffs Karen Felde, Kristoffer Martin Notice of Filing Consent to Join Lawsuit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent form for Opt-in Plaintiffs A. Abdelrasoul, A. Abdi, A. Donzo, and S. Lo) (Johnson, Larry)
May 15, 2020 Filing 28 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiffs Karen Felde, Kristoffer Martin Notice of Filing Consent to Join Lawsuit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent form for Opt-in Plaintiff Isaias Torres) (Johnson, Larry)
May 13, 2020 Filing 27 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiffs Karen Felde, Kristoffer Martin Notice of Filing Consent to Join Lawsuit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent Form for Opt-in Plaintiff Monroy Ramos) (Johnson, Larry)
May 11, 2020 Filing 26 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiffs Karen Felde, Kristoffer Martin Notice of Filing Consent to Join Lawsuit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent form for Opt-in Plaintiff Keith Covey) (Johnson, Larry)
May 1, 2020 Filing 25 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiffs Karen Felde, Kristoffer Martin Notice of Filing Consent to Join Lawsuit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent form for Opt-in Plaintiffs M. Barry, J. Heard, C. Mabiala, D. Marckenzi, and W. Montgomery) (Johnson, Larry)
May 1, 2020 Filing 24 Notice by Plaintiffs Karen Felde, Kristoffer Martin Notice of Request to Opt Out of Lawsuit for Unpaid Wages. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiff Consent to Opt-out of Unpaid Wage Lawsuit for Levan Manjgaladze) (Johnson, Larry)
April 24, 2020 Filing 23 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiffs Karen Felde, Kristoffer Martin Notice of Filing Consent to Join Lawsuit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent form for Opt-in Plaintiffs D. Hossain, E. Martinez, J. Monson, J. Pena, and R. Vil) (Johnson, Larry)
April 23, 2020 Filing 22 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiffs Karen Felde, Kristoffer Martin Notice of Filing Consent to Join Lawsuit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent form for Opt-in Plaintiffs J. Diaz, S. Tipu, and J. Umana) (Johnson, Larry)
April 23, 2020 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance filed by Michelle L. Dama for Defendant EatStreet Inc. (Dama, Michelle)
April 20, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiffs Karen Felde, Kristoffer Martin Notice of Filing Consent to Join Lawsuit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent form for Opt-in Plaintiffs B. Cline, K. Hernandez, J. Hines, E. Louka, D. Matylewich, G. McFaul, T. Richards, and G. Seidel, #2 Certificate of Service) (Johnson, Larry)
April 17, 2020 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant EatStreet Inc. EatStreet Inc waiver sent on 4/13/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. (Maynard, Timothy)
April 14, 2020 Filing 18 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiffs Karen Felde, Kristoffer Martin Notice of Filing Consent to Join Lawsuit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent form for Opt-in Plaintiffs Precious Brown and Brittany Johnson, #2 Certificate of Service) (Johnson, Larry)
April 13, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiffs Karen Felde, Kristoffer Martin Notice of Filing Consent to Join Lawsuit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent form for Opt-in Plaintiffs M. Anderson, T. Lee, L. Manjgaladze, J. McKinney, and L. Scott, #2 Certificate of Service) (Johnson, Larry)
April 10, 2020 Filing 16 Notice by Plaintiffs Karen Felde, Kristoffer Martin of Consent to Join Lawsuit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent Forms for Bryan Harris and Jonathon Mecklenburg, #2 Certificate of Service) (Maynard, Timothy)
April 10, 2020 Filing 15 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs. (Johnson, Larry) Modified on 4/10/2020. (lak)
April 10, 2020 Filing 14 Disregard. To be refiled. Modified on 4/10/2020. (lak)
April 9, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiff Kristoffer Martin Notice of Filing Consent to Join Lawsuit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent form for Opt-in Plaintiffs D. Richter and M. Richter, #2 Certificate of Service) (Maynard, Timothy)
April 6, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiff Kristoffer Martin Notice of Filing Consent to Join Lawsuit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent form for Opt-in Plaintiffs D. Fisher, J. Hames, C. Jones, and J. Medina-Maldonado, #2 Certificate of Service) (Maynard, Timothy)
April 3, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiff Kristoffer Martin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent forms for Opt in Plaintiffs A. Cleary, and N. Grundman, #2 Certificate of Service) (Maynard, Timothy)
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiff Kristoffer Martin Notice of Filing Consent to Join Lawsuit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent form for Opt-in Plaintiffs D. Manke and P. Osborne, #2 Certificate of Service) (Johnson, Larry)
April 1, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiff Kristoffer Martin Notice of Filing Consent to Join Lawsuit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent Form for Opt-in Plaintiffs N. Green, C. Heritz, J. Love, and J. Rolain, #2 Certificate of Service) (Johnson, Larry)
March 31, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiff Kristoffer Martin Notice of Filing Consent to Join Lawsuit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent form for Opt-in Plaintiffs Y. Artis, K. Felde, and K. Hart, #2 Certificate of Service) (Johnson, Larry)
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Summer Hart Murshid for Plaintiff Kristoffer Martin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Murshid, Summer)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Larry A. Johnson for Plaintiff Kristoffer Martin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Johnson, Larry)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Service by Plaintiff Kristoffer Martin as to #4 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit. (Maynard, Timothy)
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiff Kristoffer Martin Notice of Filing Consent to Join Lawsuit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent form for Opt-in Plaintiff Jennifer Miller) (Johnson, Larry)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to EatStreet Inc. (kwf)
March 27, 2020 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
March 27, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiff Kristoffer Martin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent Forms for Opt in Plaintiffs S. Charles, G. McKeeth, and R. Weich, #2 Certificate of Service) (Maynard, Timothy)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EatStreet Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2651648.), filed by Kristoffer Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent Form for Kristoffer Martin, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons EatStreet, Inc.) (Maynard, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin, Kristoffer v. EatStreet Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristoffer Martin
Represented By: Timothy Peter Maynard
Represented By: Larry A. Johnson
Represented By: Summer Hart Murshid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Felde
Represented By: Timothy Peter Maynard
Represented By: Larry A. Johnson
Represented By: Summer Hart Murshid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EatStreet Inc
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?