Jimison, Sylvia v. Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System
Plaintiff: Sylvia Jimison
Defendant: Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System
Case Number: 3:2020cv00318
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2020 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
May 20, 2020 Case randomly reassigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
May 19, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER by Defendant Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System. (Carson, Gesina)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Gesina S. Carson for Defendant Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System. (Carson, Gesina)
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Katherine Cuccia Polich for Defendant Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System. (Polich, Katherine)
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System served on 4/28/2020, answer due 5/19/2020. (McDonald, Shannon)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System. (kwf)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Sylvia Jimison. (McDonald, Shannon)
April 3, 2020 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf)
April 3, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, filed by Sylvia Jimison (McDonald, Shannon)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2655442.), filed by Sylvia Jimison. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet) (McDonald, Shannon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimison, Sylvia v. Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Jimison
Represented By: Shannon Daniel McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System
Represented By: Gesina S. Carson
Represented By: Katherine Cuccia Polich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?