LaRoche et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Laroche and Jennifer LaRoche
Defendant: CR Bard Inc and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00366
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00552. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (lak)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 4/20/2020: GRANTING #18 Parties' Amended Joint Motion to Transfer Case; DENYING as moot #15 Parties' Initial Joint Motion to Transfer Case; TRANSFERRING CASE to the U.S. District Court for the W.D. Wisconsin; and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to take all appropriate steps to effectuate the transfer. (cc: all counsel)(jm) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/21/2020.]
April 19, 2020 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE Statement by Jennifer LaRoche, Joseph LaRoche. (Knurr, Timothy) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/21/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 18 Amended MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Wisconsin by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc. (Helm, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/21/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 17 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Helm, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/21/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc. (Helm, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/21/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Wisconsin by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc. (Helm, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/21/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 14 Amended NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S Knurr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Timothy S. Knurr (Knurr, Timothy) Modified on 4/13/2020 (blr). [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/21/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S Knurr on behalf of Jennifer LaRoche. Attorney(s) appearing: Timothy S. Knurr (Knurr, Timothy) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/21/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis E Romero-Boeck on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Travis Romero-Boeck (Romero-Boeck, Travis) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/21/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/2020, MDL 15-02641, District of Arizona, transferring this case to the Eastern District of Wisconsin.(Attachments: #1 Certified Docket Sheet from MDL15-02641-PHX-DGC, District of Arizona, #2 Case Management Orders, #3 Daubert Orders, #4 Deposition Designation Orders, #5 Discovery and Privilege Orders, #6 Discovery Orders, #7 Master and Short-Form Pleadings, #8 Miscellaneous Orders, #9 Motion in Limine Orders) (cc: all counsel)(ds) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/21/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A Faught Pollard on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Catherine Faught Pollard (Faught Pollard, Catherine) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/21/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Substitution by Elizabeth C Helm on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr. to be termed. (Helm, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/21/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/2020, MDL 15-02641, District of Arizona, transferring this case to the Eastern District of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Certified Docket Sheet, #2 Case Management Orders, #3 Daubert Orders, #4 Deposition Designation Orders, #5 Discovery Privilege Orders, #6 Discovery Orders, #7 Master and Short Form Pleadings, #8 Miscellaneous Orders, #9 Motion in Limine Orders) (cc: all counsel)(asc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/21/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 Docket Annotation - email received from Levin, Papantonio, Thomas, Mitchell, Rafferty & Proctor stating that the plaintiff resides in Portage, WI in Columbia County which is located in the Western District of Wisconsin (vkb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/21/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-02168. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/21/2020.]
April 6, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/21/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Case Transferred to the Eastern District of Wisconsin via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 4/6/2020.] [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/21/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED ORDER - SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B]. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 4/6/2020.] [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/21/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/06/20. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 4/6/2020.] [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/21/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (Third). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 4/6/2020.] [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/21/2020.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-02168-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 4/6/2020.] [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/21/2020.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15710401 filed by Jennifer LaRoche, Joseph LaRoche. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 4/6/2020.] [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 4/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaRoche et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Laroche
Represented By: Matthew David Schultz
Represented By: William E Hymes
Represented By: Timothy S Knurr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer LaRoche
Represented By: Matthew David Schultz
Represented By: William E Hymes
Represented By: Timothy S Knurr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Bard Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth C Helm
Represented By: Travis E Romero-Boeck
Represented By: Catherine A Faught Pollard
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth C Helm
Represented By: Travis E Romero-Boeck
Represented By: Catherine A Faught Pollard
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?