Stigen et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mary Ellen Stigen and Merritt Stigen
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon, Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00407
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Dispositive Motions due 8/14/2020. Settlement Letters due 9/3/2021. Motions in Limine due 9/10/2021. Response to Motion due 9/24/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2021 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 10/18/2021 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/4/2020. (jls)
June 3, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 6/3/2020 [:30] (cak)
May 29, 2020 Filing 49 Status Report re Pending Daubert Motions by Defendants Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wave 7 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order Daubert Ruling re: Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D., #2 Exhibit B - Wave 1 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #3 Exhibit C - Wave 4 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order Daubert Ruling re: Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit D - Wave 1 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #5 Exhibit E - Wave 3 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order Daubert Ruling re: Peggy Pence, Ph.D., #6 Exhibit F - Wave 1 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #7 Exhibit G - Wave 7 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order Daubert Ruling re: Daniel Elliot, M.D., #8 Exhibit H - Wave 1 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #9 Exhibit I - Ethicon's Wave 3 Reply Brief re: Dr. Daniel Elliot, #10 Exhibit J - Wave 6 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #11 Exhibit K - Wave 1 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #12 Exhibit L - Wave 6 Memorandum and Order, #13 Exhibit M - Wave 3 Memorandum and Order, #14 Exhibit N - Wave 1 Memorandum and Order, #15 Exhibit O - Wave 6 Memorandum and Order, #16 Exhibit P - Wave 3 Memorandum and Order, #17 Exhibit Q - Wave 1 Memorandum and Order) (Morgenroth, Brandie)
May 29, 2020 Filing 48 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Defendants Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Morgenroth, Brandie)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #45 Motion to Admit Christopher A. Gomez Pro Hac Vice; granting #46 Motion to Admit Lee B. Balefsky Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 5/28/2020. (lak)
May 28, 2020 Filing 46 Motion to Admit Lee B. Balefsky Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2685230.) by Plaintiffs Mary Ellen Stigen, Merritt Stigen. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Balefsky, Lee)
May 28, 2020 Filing 45 Motion to Admit Christopher A. Gomez Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2685204.) by Plaintiffs Mary Ellen Stigen, Merritt Stigen. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Gomez, Christopher)
May 6, 2020 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Johnson & Johnson. (Morgenroth, Brandie)
May 6, 2020 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Ethicon, Inc. (Morgenroth, Brandie)
May 1, 2020 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
May 1, 2020 Set Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 6/3/2020 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. #Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached. (arw)
May 1, 2020 Case directly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
April 30, 2020 Filing 42 Notice by Defendants Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson Removing Counsel. (Morgenroth, Brandie)
April 30, 2020 Filing 41 Notice of Appearance of Tracy J. Van Steenburgh filed by Tracy J Van Steenburgh for Defendants Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Van Steenburgh, Tracy)
April 30, 2020 Filing 40 Notice of Appearance of Brandie Morgenroth filed by Brandie L. Morgenroth for Defendants Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Morgenroth, Brandie)
April 30, 2020 Filing 39 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:15-cv-13307. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (lak)
April 22, 2020 Filing 38 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #28 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) Defs Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Envelope MDL ECF (6860) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (6965) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (7143) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski)(Gage, William) (Modified on 4/23/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 37 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #28 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2205) Part 1 Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 2 Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 3 Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2206) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 1 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 2 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2297) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 1 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 2 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 3 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2825) Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2826) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2942) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (3053) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (6824) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (6998) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (7100) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean)(Gage, William) (Modified on 4/23/2020 to add party filers)(msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 36 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #28 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2003) Pls Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2004) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2175) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2240) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2469) Pls Amd Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2470) - Pls Mem in Support of Amd Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #7 Envelope MDL ECF (2618) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2925) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6817) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (6941) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (7136) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala)(Gage, William) (Modified on 4/23/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 35 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #28 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2130) Pls Mot to Exclude Brian J. Flynn, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2131) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Brian J. Flynn, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2269) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Brian J. Flynn, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2280) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Brian J. Flynn, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2854) Pls Mot to Exclude Brian J. Flynn, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2855) - Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Brian J. Flynn, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2913) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Brian J. Flynn, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3048) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Brian J. Flynn, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6799) Amended Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Brian J. Flynn, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (6987) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Brian J. Flynn, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (7094) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude Brian J. Flynn)(Gage, William) (Modified on 4/23/2020 to add party filers)(msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 34 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #28 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (6876) Pls Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (6877) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (7020) Part 1 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (7020) Part 2 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling)(Gage, William) (Modified on 4/23/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 33 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #28 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 3 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 4 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 5 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 6 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Envelope MDL ECF (2047) Part 7 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 8 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 9 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 10 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 11 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 12- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 13 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 14 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2049) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2241) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2931) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (5332) - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (5333) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #26 Exhibit MDL ECF (5482) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #27 Exhibit MDL ECF (5548) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #28 Exhibit MDL ECF (6852) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #29 Exhibit MDL ECF (6960) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) (Modified on 4/23/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 32 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #28 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2075) - Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2078) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2172) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2214) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2759) - Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2760) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2949) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3017) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6821) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (6958) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (7177) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence)(Gage, William) (Modified on 4/23/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 31 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #28 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2200) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3630) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 4 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3855) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (6648) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (6833) Amended Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (6926) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (7123) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) (Modified on 4/23/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 30 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #28 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1978) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 3- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 4- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 5- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 6- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 7- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 8- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 9- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 10- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 11- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 12- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 13- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 14- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Envelope MDL ECF (1978) Part 15- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 16- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 17- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 18- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 19- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 20- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 21- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (1982) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #26 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 4 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) (Modified on 4/23/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 29 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #28 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2082) Part 1 - Defs Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2082) Part 2 - Defs Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2082) Part 3 - Defs Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2085) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2191) Pls Amended Resp to Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2215) Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2815) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2952) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (5339) Part 1 - Defs Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (5339) Part 2 - Defs Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (5340) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (5491) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (6842) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot and Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (6922) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott)(Gage, William) (Modified on 4/23/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 28 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) Amended Short Form Complaint)(Gage, William) (Modified on 4/23/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 4/30/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 4/29/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/16/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 - List of Cases, #2 Exhibit Exh 2 - Letter)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Mary Ellen Stigen, Merritt Stigen (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (sak) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 21 OPPOSITION by Mary Ellen Stigen, Merritt Stigen to #18 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITIONS OF FRIENDS AND FAMILY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Merritt Stigen on dates and at times to be determined. (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #18 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendants Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of filing Subpoena by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Schedule A, #2 Deposition Protocol)(Modak-Truran, Anita) (Modified on 8/6/2018 to remove link to #15 notice) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 15 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Kevin Hallman, M.D. on September 11, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. (Attachment: #1 Pretrial Order #38)(Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRETRIAL ORDER # 303 (Amended Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 280. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases) (brn) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
June 6, 2018 Filing 13 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Mary Stigen on 6/7/2018 at 2:00 p.m. (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Mary Stigen on 6/7/2018 at 2:00 p.m. (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
May 31, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Eileen Marie Somers on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Somers, Eileen) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Modak-Truran, Anita) (Modified on 5/23/2018 to remove party filer) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
March 22, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Paul Stokely Rosenblatt on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rosenblatt, Paul) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
March 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Anita Modak-Truran on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
January 31, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Kevin Hallman on 3/26/18 at 9:00 a.m. (Jones, Alyson) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
June 5, 2017 Filing 5 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Mary Ellen Stigen, Merritt Stigen. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
November 6, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
October 27, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
September 21, 2015 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 195 (First Amended Docket Control Order - Wave 1 Cases) entered on 09/03/2015 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]
September 18, 2015 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-4127755. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 4/30/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stigen et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ellen Stigen
Represented By: Lee B. Balefsky
Represented By: Michelle L. Tiger
Represented By: Christopher A. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merritt Stigen
Represented By: Lee B. Balefsky
Represented By: Michelle L. Tiger
Represented By: Christopher A. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Eileen Marie Somers
Represented By: Tracy J Van Steenburgh
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Paul Stokely Rosenblatt
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Represented By: Brandie L. Morgenroth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc
Represented By: Eileen Marie Somers
Represented By: Tracy J Van Steenburgh
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Paul Stokely Rosenblatt
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Represented By: Brandie L. Morgenroth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?