Whitecap Mountain Recreation, Inc. et al v. Axis Surplus Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Penokee Skiing Company, LLC, Whitecap Mountain Recreation, Inc. and Penokee Holding Company, LLC
Defendant: Axis Surplus Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00424
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 8/7/2020. Dispositive Motions due 1/22/2021. Settlement Letters due 5/14/2021. Motions in Limine due 5/21/2021. Response to Motion due 6/4/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/16/2021 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 6/21/2021 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/22/2020. (jls)
June 18, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 6/18/2020 [:10] (cak)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The parties' stipulation is accepted and their proposed protective order is entered as the court's order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/15/2020. (jls)
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order by Defendant Axis Surplus Insurance Company. (Kugler, Mollie) Modified on 6/12/2020. (lak)
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Kugler, Mollie)
May 13, 2020 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2020 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Axis Surplus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Insurance Policy) (Kugler, Mollie)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 Record from Iron County. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Filing Notice, #2 Summons & Complaint, #3 Certificates of Service, #4 Notice of Appearance, #5 Notice of Removal and Removal) (jls)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Peter E Kanaris for Defendant Axis Surplus Insurance Company. (Kanaris, Peter)
May 6, 2020 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
May 6, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Axis Surplus Insurance Company. (Kugler, Mollie)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Mollie T Kugler for Defendant Axis Surplus Insurance Company. (Kugler, Mollie)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Iron County Circuit Court, case number 20-cv-3. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2672712), filed by Axis Surplus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Circuit Court Complaint) (Kugler, Mollie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitecap Mountain Recreation, Inc. et al v. Axis Surplus Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penokee Skiing Company, LLC
Represented By: Daniel F. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitecap Mountain Recreation, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel F. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penokee Holding Company, LLC
Represented By: Daniel F. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axis Surplus Insurance Company
Represented By: Mollie T Kugler
Represented By: Peter E Kanaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?