Mechanical Systems, Inc. v. Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce et al
Plaintiff: Mechanical Systems, Inc.
Defendant: ND Paper, Inc., Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce and Computershare Trust Company of Canada
Case Number: 3:2020cv00510
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance of Counsel filed by Aaron Dean for Plaintiff Mechanical Systems, Inc.. (Dean, Aaron)
July 31, 2020 Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 8/31/2020. (lak)
July 30, 2020 Filing 15 Affidavit of Chaodan Zheng filed by Defendant ND Paper, Inc. re: #14 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Amendment No. 1 (Chudoba, Brandi) Modified on 7/31/2020: Added name of Affiant. Added exhibit descriptions. Second e-mail sent to counsel. (lak)
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant ND Paper, Inc. Brief in Opposition due 8/20/2020. Brief in Reply due 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing and Certificate of Service) (Chudoba, Brandi) Modified on 7/31/2020. (lak)
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 Disregard. E-mail sent to counsel. Modified on 7/31/2020. (lak)
July 8, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: ND Paper, Inc. answer due 7/30/2020. (kwf)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Defendant ND Paper has asked for a 28-day extension of its deadline to answer or otherwise respond (dkt. #6 ); plaintiff opposes this, contending that ND Paper has had plenty of time to investigate this case, so that this is merely a stalling maneuver. (dkt. #10 ). While plaintiff may be correct, as a practical matter, the court isn't going to schedule the telephonic preliminary pretrial conference until the two other defendants have appeared and filed their answers or responses, so it's not clear that denying ND Paper's request actually will speed things up. The court will grant the 28 day extension while advising all parties--including those who have not yet appeared--that the court intends to schedule this case aggressively once all of the parties have appeared. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/8/2020. (kwf)
July 1, 2020 Filing 11 Declaration of Devlan Sheahan filed by Plaintiff Mechanical Systems, Inc. re: #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (Sheahan, Devlan)
July 1, 2020 Filing 10 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Mechanical Systems, Inc. re: #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by ND Paper, Inc. (Sheahan, Devlan)
July 1, 2020 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. ND Paper, Inc. served on 6/11/2020, answer due 7/2/2020. (lak)
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 Disregard. Modified on 7/1/2020. (lak)
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 Demand for Trial by Jury by Defendant ND Paper, Inc. (Chudoba, Brandi)
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant ND Paper, Inc.. Response due 7/7/2020. (Chudoba, Brandi)
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Brandi L. Chudoba for Defendant ND Paper, Inc.. (Chudoba, Brandi)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Mechanical Systems, Inc.. (Sheahan, Devlan)
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce, Computershare Trust Company of Canada, ND Paper, Inc. (kwf)
June 9, 2020 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf)
June 9, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce, Computershare Trust Company of Canada, ND Paper, Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2690043.), filed by Mechanical Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Contract, #2 Exhibit 2 - Contract's Amendment, #3 Exhibit 3 - General Conditions, #4 Exhibit 4 - MSI's Change Order Request, #5 Exhibit 5 - MSI's Change Order Request, #6 Exhibit 6 - MSI's Change Order Request, #7 Exhibit 7 - Notice of Intention to File Claim for Lien and an Affidavit of Service, #8 Exhibit 8 - Claim for Lien, #9 Exhibit 9 - Affidavit of Service, #10 Exhibit 10 - Amended Claim for Lien, #11 Exhibit 11 - Affidavit of Service, #12 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Summons Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce, #14 Summons Computershare Trust Company of Canada, #15 Summons ND Paper, Inc.) (Sheahan, Devlan)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 Disregard; see #2 . Modified on 6/9/2020. (kwf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mechanical Systems, Inc. v. Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ND Paper, Inc.
Represented By: Brandi L. Chudoba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Computershare Trust Company of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mechanical Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Devlan Sheahan
Represented By: Aaron Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?