Heard, Anthony v. Taylor et al
Case Number: 3:2020cv00555
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that This case is dismissed for plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Because this case is being dismissed for one of the reasons listed in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g), the clerk of court is directed to record a "strike" against plaintiff.The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendants and close the case. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/16/2020. (rks),(ps)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that that plaintiff Anthony P. Heard, Jr. may have until July 28, 2020, to submit a supplement to his complaint. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/7/2020. (rks),(ps)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 137.73 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 7/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 06/19/20. (aom),(ps)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Plaintiff submit Trust Fund Account Statement by 7/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 06/18/20. (aom),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heard, Anthony v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?