Great American Insurance Company v. Gilbertson, Brian et al
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company
Defendant: Northern Capital Partners I, LP and Brian Gilbertson
Case Number: 3:2020cv00612
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph John Cassioppi for Defendant Northern Capital Partners I, LP. (Cassioppi, Joseph)
August 27, 2020 Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff requested to promptly file proof of service. (voc)
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Northern Capital Partners I, LP. (Murphy, Ryan)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against Brian Gilbertson, COUNTERCLAIM against Great American Insurance Company by Defendant Northern Capital Partners I, LP. (Murphy, Ryan) Modified on 8/11/2020 (jls).
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Ryan Murphy for Defendant Northern Capital Partners I, LP. (Murphy, Ryan)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Northern Capital Partners I, LP. (voc)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company. (Leo, Thomas)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Disregard. Modified on 7/15/2020. (lak)
July 6, 2020 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
July 6, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Indemnification and Specific Performance against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2708174.), filed by Great American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - The Bond, #3 Exhibit B - General Indemnity Agreement Executed March 14, 2017, #4 Exhibit C - General Indemnity Agreement Executed May 3, 2019, #5 Exhibit D - The Claim) (Leo, Thomas) Modified on 7/2/2020: Deleted address. Corrected party. Corrected county. Added exhibit descriptions. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great American Insurance Company v. Gilbertson, Brian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Capital Partners I, LP
Represented By: Ryan Murphy
Represented By: Joseph John Cassioppi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Gilbertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Scott Leo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?