Glover, Bruce v. Veteran's Administration, et al
Plaintiff: Bruce Stephen Glover
Defendant: U.S. Senate Tammy Baldwin, Social Security Administration and Veteran's Administration
Case Number: 3:2020cv00613
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 16 Letter Supplement to #1 Complaint, filed by Bruce Stephen Glover. (Attachments: #1 BNY Mellon Payment Summary, #2 Envelope) (nln),(ps)
August 21, 2020 Filing 15 Letter Supplement to #1 Complaint, filed by Bruce Stephen Glover. (Attachments: #1 Application for Survivors Benefits, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
August 13, 2020 Filing 14 Copy of letter sent to Bruce Glover from Wis. Dept. of Agriculture, Trade and Consumer Protection filed by Plaintiff Bruce Glover. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Consumer Complaint filed, #2 Envelope) (aom),(ps)
August 10, 2020 Filing 13 Letter Supplement to #1 Complaint, filed by Bruce Stephen Glover. (Attachments: #1 Wheaten Franciscan Healthcare Personnel Action Form, 2/9/08, #2 WI Home Energy Assistance Program letter, 2/5/20, #3 Letter from plaintiff, 7/8/19 filed stamped EDWI and 7th Circuit, #4 WI Unemployment Insurance Decision, 10/31/08, #5 Letter from St. Michael Hospital human resources, 10/11/04, #6 St. Joseph Hospital letter, 11/13/08, #7 WI Home Energy Assistance Program letter, 5/20/18, #8 Milwaukee Co. Hospital records page excerpt, 1966, #9 WI Dept. of Health and Family Services estate recovery letter, 6/20/06, #10 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 Letter Supplement to #4 Amended Complaint, filed by Bruce Stephen Glover. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps)
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 Letter regarding claims / Supplement to #4 Amended Complaint, filed by Bruce Stephen Glover, #1 Complaint, filed by Bruce Stephen Glover (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Disabilityrigts Wisconsin, #2 Exhibit 2 - Payment Summary BNY Mellon Asset Servicing, #3 Exhibit 3 - Department of Veterans Affairs Legal Gdnship, #4 Exhibit 4 - Wheaten Franciscan Health Care Account Balance Data Form, #5 Exhibit 5 - Psychological Health Services, #6 Envelope) (aom),(ps)
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 Letter regarding claims / Supplement to #4 Amended Complaint, filed by Bruce Stephen Glover. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/15/2020. (jef),(ps)
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 Amended Financial Affidavit re: #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Bruce Stephen Glover. (Attachments: #1 Order, dkt. #5 , #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 Letter regarding claims / Supplement to #4 Amended Complaint, filed by Bruce Stephen Glover. (Attachments: #1 Letter regarding disability benefits from Social Security Administration, 1/8/07, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 Letter regarding claims / Supplement to #4 Amended Complaint, filed by Bruce Stephen Glover. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on ifp request: Amended Financial Affidavit due 7/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/7/2020. (jef),(ps)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Veteran's Administration, Social Security Administration, filed by plaintiff Bruce Glover. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Letter from Wis Court of Appeals, 5/1719, #3 Employment verification form, #4 Lamar Walker death certificate, #5 Clinic progress notes and evaluation, 9/12/16, #6 Clinic evaluation, 1/15/2019, #7 Envelopes) (jef),(ps) Note, there was no pg. 3 included. (jef).
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 Letter from plaintiff regarding putting wrong things on the forms. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Bruce Stephen Glover. (jef),(ps) Note, first page is missing. (jef)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (unsigned) against All Defendants, filed by Bruce Stephen Glover. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Letter from Tammy Baldwin, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (jef),(ps) Complaint is missing pages 2-4, and is unsigned. (jef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glover, Bruce v. Veteran's Administration, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Stephen Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Senate Tammy Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Albert Bianchi, Jr.
Represented By: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veteran's Administration
Represented By: David Daly Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?