DeGroot, Derek v. Carr, Kevin et al
Plaintiff: Derek J. DeGroot
Defendant: HSU - Manager Ms. Barker, Kevin A. Carr and Mario Canziani
Case Number: 3:2020cv00657
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting plaintiff Derek McGroot's #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's $37.57 initial partial filing fee due 9/21/2020. If plaintiff does not have enough money to make the initial partial payment from plaintiff's regular account, plaintiff should arrange with authorities to pay the remainder from plaintiff's release account. If by September 21, 2020, plaintiff fails to make the initial partial payment or show cause for his failure to do so, plaintiff will be held to have withdrawn this case voluntarily and the case will be closed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/27/2020. (jef),(ps)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 Motion for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Derek J. DeGroot. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiff Derek McGroot has filed a letter, dkt. #8 , in which he requests an extension of time to submit the $37.57 initial partial payment of the filing fee. Plaintiff's request for an extension of time to submit the initial partial payment is GRANTED. Plaintiff may have August 31, 2020 to submit the $37.57 initial partial payment. If by August 31, plaintiff fails to make the initial partial payment or show cause for his failure to do so, plaintiff will be held to have withdrawn this case voluntarily and the case will be closed without prejudice. Plaintiff's request to file an amended complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1), which permits plaintiff to amend his complaint as a matter of course at this stage of the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/5/2020. (jef),(ps)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 Letter requesting extension to pay the initial partial filing fee and to file and amended complaint naming Tony Evers as an additional defendant by Plaintiff Derek J. DeGroot. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $37.57 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 8/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/17/2020. (jef),(ps)
July 17, 2020 Judge update in case. Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley. (jef),(ps)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-01059. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (jef)
July 17, 2020 Case Electronically Transmitted to the USDC for the Western District of Wisconsin on 7/17/2020. (asc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 7/16/2020: TRANSFERRING CASE to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to take all appropriate steps to effectuate the transfer. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Derek J DeGroot at Stanley Correctional Institution)(jm) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER re case from plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(asc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Derek J DeGroot. (asc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/17/2020.] (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020: #1 IPP Calculation) (jef).
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Derek J DeGroot. (asc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Derek J DeGroot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(asc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeGroot, Derek v. Carr, Kevin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek J. DeGroot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSU - Manager Ms. Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin A. Carr
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Canziani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?