Phillips, Michael v. Mega Concrete Construction, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Phillips
Defendant: Connie Noble, Mega Concrete Construction, LLC, Jeffrey M Hariu, Bryan J Sipple, Classic Custom Homes of Waunakee, Inc., Precision Carpentry LLC, Robert Gallagher, Bryan Sipple and Jeff Hariu
Case Number: 3:2020cv00658
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2020 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Robert Gallagher, filed by Plaintiff Michael Phillips. (O'Connor, Patrick)
September 5, 2020 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Jeff Hariu served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (O'Connor, Patrick) Modified on 9/8/2020: Service date? (lak)
September 5, 2020 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Precision Carpentry LLC served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (O'Connor, Patrick) Modified on 9/8/2020: Service date? (lak)
September 5, 2020 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Jeffrey Hariu, filed by Plaintiff Michael Phillips. (O'Connor, Patrick)
September 5, 2020 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Precision Carpentry LLC, filed by Plaintiff Michael Phillips. (O'Connor, Patrick)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Mega Concrete Construction, LLC. Mega Concrete Construction, LLC waiver sent on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (O'Connor, Patrick)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Bryan Sipple. Bryan Sipple waiver sent on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (O'Connor, Patrick)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Classic Custom Homes of Waunakee, Inc.. Classic Custom Homes of Waunakee, Inc. waiver sent on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (O'Connor, Patrick)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Connie Noble. Connie Noble waiver sent on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (O'Connor, Patrick)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 Disregard. Modified on 9/4/2020. (kwf)
September 4, 2020 Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff requested to promptly file proof of service. (kwf)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Classic Custom Homes of Waunakee, Inc., Robert Gallagher, Jeffrey M Hariu, Mega Concrete Construction, LLC, Connie Noble, Precision Carpentry LLC, Bryan J Sipple. (kwf)
July 20, 2020 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf)
July 20, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2716783.), filed by Michael Phillips. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Mega Concrete Construction, LLC, #3 Summons Connie Noble, #4 Summons Classic Custom Homes of Waunakee, Inc., #5 Summons Bryan J. Sipple, #6 Summons Precision Carpentry LLC, #7 Summons Jeffrey Hariu, #8 Summons Robert Gallagher) (O'Connor, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips, Michael v. Mega Concrete Construction, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Noble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mega Concrete Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey M Hariu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan J Sipple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classic Custom Homes of Waunakee, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Carpentry LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Sipple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Hariu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Phillips
Represented By: Patrick O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?