Schwechel, Denise v. Saul, Andrew
Plaintiff: Denise Schwechel
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv00700
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Peter A Oppeneer
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Andrew Saul served on 9/4/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Duncan, Dana)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. Materials returned to plaintiff's counsel for service. (kwf)
August 31, 2020 $400 filing fee paid; receipt number 0758-2740139. (Duncan, Dana)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Fee due 8/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/31/2020. (kwf)
July 31, 2020 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
July 31, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (kwf)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Denise Schwechel. (Duncan, Dana)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul., filed by Denise Schwechel. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Duncan, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwechel, Denise v. Saul, Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Albert Bianchi, Jr.
Represented By: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Schwechel
Represented By: Dana W. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?