Hansmeier, Paul v. Barr, William
Plaintiff: Paul Hansmeier
Defendant: William Barr
Case Number: 3:2020cv00710
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 21.31 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 9/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/12/2020. (jef),(ps)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Paul Hansmeier. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2020: #3 IPP Calculation) (jef).
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Plaintiff submit Trust Fund Account Statement by 8/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 07/31/20. (aom),(ps)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 Memorandum in Support of #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Paul Hansmeier (aom),(ps)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Paul Hansmeier. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Authorized Prison Official) (aom),(ps)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Paul Hansmeier. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hansmeier, Paul v. Barr, William
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Hansmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: David Daly Conway
Represented By: Timothy Michael O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?