Wisconsin Laborers Pension Fund et al v. Wayne's Caulking, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Laborers District Council, Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers District Council of Wisconsin, james vick, International Masonry Institute, Wisconsin Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust Fund, Contract Administration Fund, Wisconsin Laborers Health Fund, Wisconsin Masons Pension Fund, Industry Advancement Program/Contract Administration Fund, Wisconsin Laborers Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Wisconsin Masons Health Care Fund, Wisconsin Masons Education/JAC Fund, International Union of Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers, International Pension Fund/Pension Protection Act Funding Improvement Plan, Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Wisconsin Laborers Pension Fund and John J. Schmitt
Defendant: Wayne's Caulking, LLC, Wayne's Caulking, Inc., and Wayne's Caulking, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00717
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Set Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2020 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. #Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached. (arw)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Wayne's Caulking, Inc.. (Steffek, Anthony)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Wayne's Caulking, LLC. (Steffek, Anthony)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance of Tiffany E. Woelfel filed by Tiffany Woelfel for Defendants Wayne's Caulking, Inc., Wayne's Caulking, LLC. (Woelfel, Tiffany)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Wayne's Caulking, LLC. (Steffek, Anthony)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Wayne's Caulking, Inc.. (Steffek, Anthony)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance of Anthony J. Steffek filed by Anthony J. Steffek for Defendants Wayne's Caulking, Inc., Wayne's Caulking, LLC. (Steffek, Anthony)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER by Defendants Wayne's Caulking, Inc., Wayne's Caulking, LLC. (Steffek, Anthony)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Wayne's Caulking, Inc. and Wayne's Caulking, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Wayne's Cauking, LLC) (arw)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiffs Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers District Council of Wisconsin, Industry Advancement Program/Contract Administration Fund, International Masonry Institute, International Pension Fund/Pension Protection Act Funding Improvement Plan, International Union of Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers, John J. Schmitt, James Vick, Wisconsin Laborers Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Wisconsin Laborers District Council, Wisconsin Laborers Health Fund, Wisconsin Laborers Pension Fund, Wisconsin Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust Fund, Contract Administration Fund, Wisconsin Masons Education/JAC Fund, Wisconsin Masons Health Care Fund, Wisconsin Masons Pension Fund. (Ho, Yingtao)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiffs Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers District Council of Wisconsin, Industry Advancement Program/Contract Administration Fund, International Masonry Institute, International Pension Fund/Pension Protection Act Funding Improvement Plan, International Union of Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers, John J. Schmitt, James Vick, Wisconsin Laborers Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Wisconsin Laborers District Council, Wisconsin Laborers Health Fund, Wisconsin Laborers Pension Fund, Wisconsin Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust Fund, Contract Administration Fund, Wisconsin Masons Education/JAC Fund, Wisconsin Masons Health Care Fund, Wisconsin Masons Pension Fund. (Ho, Yingtao)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wayne's Caulking c/o Wayne Kruse, Registered Agent. (arw)
August 6, 2020 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
August 6, 2020 Case directly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wayne's Caulking, Inc., Wayne's Caulking, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2725344) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ho, Yingtao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wisconsin Laborers Pension Fund et al v. Wayne's Caulking, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Laborers District Council
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers District Council of Wisconsin
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: james vick
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Masonry Institute
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust Fund, Contract Administration Fund
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Laborers Health Fund
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Masons Pension Fund
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Industry Advancement Program/Contract Administration Fund
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Laborers Apprenticeship and Training Fund
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Masons Health Care Fund
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Masons Education/JAC Fund
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Pension Fund/Pension Protection Act Funding Improvement Plan
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Laborers Pension Fund
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Schmitt
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne's Caulking, LLC
Represented By: Anthony J. Steffek
Represented By: Tiffany Woelfel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne's Caulking, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne's Caulking, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony J. Steffek
Represented By: Tiffany Woelfel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?