Becker, Jeffrey et al v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin
Plaintiff: Jennifer Becker and Jeffrey Becker
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin
Case Number: 3:2020cv00724
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (jls)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (Lueder, Michael)
September 1, 2020 Notice to Counsel: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2020 is canceled. (jls)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Settlement by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin (Lueder, Michael)
August 13, 2020 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
August 13, 2020 Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 9/2/2020. (lak)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 Declaration of Amy Moehl filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin re: #3 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Coverage, #2 Exhibit 2 - Benefit Booklet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Employee Benefits Plan) (Lueder, Michael)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin. (Lueder, Michael)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 Brief in Support of #3 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Disregard. To be refiled. E-mail sent to counsel.) (Lueder, Michael) Modified on 8/12/2020. (lak)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS Plaintiffs' Complaint and Strike Jury Demand by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin. Brief in Opposition due 9/2/2020. Brief in Reply due 9/14/2020. (Lueder, Michael)
August 5, 2020 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jls)
August 5, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 Declaration of Dianna Moeller re #1 Notice of Removal, (Lueder, Michael)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of Wisconsin Circuit Court of Dane County, case number 2020CV1340. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2726489), filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Summons, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Moeller (Place Holder)) (Lueder, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Becker, Jeffrey et al v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin
Represented By: Michael C. Lueder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Becker
Represented By: Justin Franklyn Wallace
Represented By: Joshua Michael Greatsinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Becker
Represented By: Justin Franklyn Wallace
Represented By: Joshua Michael Greatsinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?