Hardy, John v. Olstad, Ty
Plaintiff: John Hardy
Defendant: Ty Olstad
Case Number: 3:2020cv00754
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Default Judgment; an amended complaint and declaration describing counsel's investigation into whether the allegations in the complaint have evidentiary support are due by 10/23/2020. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 10/9/2020. (jls)
October 8, 2020 Set/Reset Telephonic Hearing: Default Hearing set for 11/10/2020 at 08:30 AM before District Judge James D. Peterson. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5504. If defendant wishes to appear, defendant must provide the court with a telephone number at which defendant can be reached. (jls)
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant Ty Olstad. (jls)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 Declaration of Kyle Hanson filed by Plaintiff John Hardy re: #4 Motion for Default Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Judgment) (Hanson, Kyle)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 Exhibit to #4 Motion for Default Judgment filed by John Hardy (Proposed Order) (Hanson, Kyle)
October 7, 2020 Judge update in case. Case now assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 Declaration of John Hardy filed by Plaintiff John Hardy re: #4 Motion for Default Judgment (Hanson, Kyle)
October 7, 2020 Filing 4 Motion for Default Judgment as to Ty Olstad. (Hanson, Kyle) Modified on 10/7/2020. (lak)
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Ty Olstad served on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Hanson, Kyle)
October 2, 2020 Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff requested to promptly file proof of service. (jls)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ty Olstad. (jls)
August 12, 2020 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jls)
August 12, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ty Olstad. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2730505.), filed by John Hardy. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons) (Hanson, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardy, John v. Olstad, Ty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Olstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hardy
Represented By: Kyle Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?