Earle et al v. Standard Process, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Antitrend LLC and Daniel R. Earle
Defendant: Standard Process Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00756
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 31 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (rks)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiffs have filed a notice of voluntary dismissal of their claims with prejudice. Dkt. #29 . Because the notice is not signed by all parties who have appeared, a court order is required to effectuate the dismissal. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1). The court will GRANT plaintiffs' motion. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 8/21/2020. (rks)
August 13, 2020 Filing 29 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss by Plaintiffs Daniel R. Earle and The Antitrend LLC. (jls)
August 13, 2020 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (rks)
August 13, 2020 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (rks)
August 12, 2020 Filing 28 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:19-cv-10613. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (lak)
March 20, 2020 Filing 27 Case transferred to Western District of Wisconsin. Case file electronically sent to Clerk in that district. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-10613-RWZ, 1:19-cv-10952-RWZ(McKillop, Matthew) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 26 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. Standard Processs Motion to Consolidate and Transfer Venue (C.A. 19-10613, Docket #8) is allowed. The Plaintiffs motion in C.A. 19-10952 to remand (Docket #13) is denied. C.A. 19-10613 and C.A. 19-10952, shall be transferred to the Western District of Wisconsin.Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-10613-RWZ, 1:19-cv-10952-RWZ(Pezzarossi, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Consolidate and Transfer Venue by Standard Process, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Supplemental Brief and Exhibits Thereto)(Toms, Keith) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 24 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel: Motion Hearing held on 9/10/2019 re (8 in 1:19-cv-10613-RWZ) MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Transfer filed by Standard Process, Inc., (13 in 1:19-cv-10952-RWZ, 13 in 1:19-cv-10952-RWZ) MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by The Antitrend LLC, Daniel R. Earle. Judge hears counsel and will decide the motion to remand; (Court Reporter: Linda Walsh at lwalshsteno@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Wells, Allen & Kloss) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-10613-RWZ, 1:19-cv-10952-RWZ(Urso, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 23 Set/Reset Hearings: Hearing set for 9/10/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Time change only) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-10613-RWZ, 1:19-cv-10952-RWZ(Urso, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion (8 in 1:19-cv-10613-RWZ) MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Transfer : Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-10613-RWZ, 1:19-cv-10952-RWZ(Urso, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to #8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Transfer filed by Standard Process, Inc.. (Allen, Nicholas) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 20 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #19 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Urso, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 19 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate and Transfer by Standard Process, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Reply))(Allen, Nicholas) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 18 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Transfer Responses due by 5/17/2019 (Urso, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Transfer filed by Daniel R. Earle, The Antitrend LLC. (Wells, Brian) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 5/17.2019 to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Transfer by Daniel R. Earle, The Antitrend LLC.(Wells, Brian) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 15 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added William D. Kloss, Jr., Katherine Greiner Barnes, Angelyne Lisinski. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McKillop, Matthew) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 14 Document filed in Error on 5/16/2019 (McKillop, Matthew). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Thomson on behalf of Standard Process, Inc. (Thomson, James) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William D. Kloss, Jr.; Katherine Greiner Banks; Angelyne Lisinski Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number 0101-7668292 by Standard Process, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Allen, Nicholas) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith E. Toms on behalf of Standard Process, Inc. (Toms, Keith) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #9 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Transfer . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Allen, Nicholas) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Transfer filed by Standard Process, Inc.. (Allen, Nicholas) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Transfer by Standard Process, Inc..(Allen, Nicholas) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Standard Process, Inc..(Allen, Nicholas) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Standard Process, Inc.. (Allen, Nicholas) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas W. Allen on behalf of Standard Process, Inc. (Allen, Nicholas) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Paine, Matthew) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Standard Process, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7614766 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Daniel R. Earle, The Antitrend LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 AO120)(Wells, Brian) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 8/12/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Earle et al v. Standard Process, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Process Inc.
Represented By: James J. Thomson
Represented By: Keith E. Toms
Represented By: Angelyne E. Lisinski
Represented By: Nicholas W. Allen
Represented By: Katherine Greiner Barnes
Represented By: William D. Kloss, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Antitrend LLC
Represented By: Brian K. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel R. Earle
Represented By: Brian K. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?