Amsoil, Inc. v. Remver LLC
Plaintiff: Amsoil, Inc.
Defendant: Remver LLC doing business as Remver Consulting
Case Number: 3:2020cv00759
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Dispositive Motions due 9/17/2021. Settlement Letters due 1/14/2022. Motions in Limine due 1/21/2022. Responses due 2/4/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 4:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 2/28/2022 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/24/2020. (kwf)
September 24, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 9/22/2020 [:10] (cak)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 Brief in Reply by Defendant Remver LLC in Support of #5 Motion to Dismiss, (Johanningmeier, Joshua)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Johanningmeier, Joshua)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Amsoil, Inc. re: #5 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Remver LLC (Olson, Joseph)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Amsoil, Inc.. (Olson, Joseph)
August 20, 2020 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2020 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS Pursuant to Forum Non Conveniens by Defendant Remver LLC. Brief in Opposition due 9/8/2020. Brief in Reply due 9/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition in Dallas Cty, Texas Cause No. DC-20-10819) (Johanningmeier, Joshua)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Justin Scott Cohen for Defendant Remver LLC. (Cohen, Justin)
August 13, 2020 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
August 13, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Erin M. Cook for Defendant Remver LLC. (Cook, Erin)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Remver LLC. (Johanningmeier, Joshua)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Douglas County Circuit Court, case number 20cv125. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2730842), filed by Remver LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index, state court filings, #2 Exhibit B - state court docket, #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johanningmeier, Joshua) Modified on 8/13/2020. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amsoil, Inc. v. Remver LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remver LLC doing business as Remver Consulting
Represented By: Joshua Lee Johanningmeier
Represented By: Justin Scott Cohen
Represented By: Erin M. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amsoil, Inc.
Represented By: David Nathaniel Shea
Represented By: Joseph Louis Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?