Grabrick, Christina v. Saul, Andrew
Plaintiff: Christina L. Grabrick
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv00781
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: Peter A Oppeneer
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Returned Executed. Andrew M. Saul served on 9/11/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Schultz, Barry)
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Returned Executed. Andrew M. Saul served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Schultz, Barry)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Returned Executed by Defendant Andrew M. Saul. Andrew M. Saul served on 9/3/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Schultz, Barry)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of AC Decision dated 6/25/2020 by Plaintiff Christina L. Grabrick. (Schultz, Barry) Modified on 8/27/2020. (lak)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul. Materials returned to plaintiff counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons Commissioner of Social Security, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office) (voc)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** From the affidavit of indigency plaintiff has submitted, I find that plaintiff is unable to prepay the fees and costs of commencing this action or to give security therefor. Accordingly, plaintiff's petition for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee is granted. The clerk of court shall issue summonses and forward them to plaintiff's counsel for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/25/2020. (voc)
August 25, 2020 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (voc)
August 25, 2020 Judge update in case. Case now assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker and Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (voc)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Christina L. Grabrick. (Schultz, Barry)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Christina L. Grabrick. (Schultz, Barry)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Barry Alan Schultz for Plaintiff Christina L. Grabrick. (Schultz, Barry)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul., filed by Christina L. Grabrick. (Attachments: #1 AC decision, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Schultz, Barry) Modified on 8/25/2020: Complaint is captioned for the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division. E-mail sent to counsel. Amended complaint to be filed. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grabrick, Christina v. Saul, Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Albert Bianchi, Jr.
Represented By: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina L. Grabrick
Represented By: Barry Alan Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?