Sommer, Julie v. Saul, Andrew
Plaintiff: Julie A. Sommer
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv00787
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Peter A Oppeneer
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:427
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed. Andrew M. Saul served on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. (Schultz, Barry)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed by Defendant Andrew M. Saul. Andrew M. Saul served on 9/11/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. (Schultz, Barry)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Jean Godfrey for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Godfrey, Jean)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul. Materials returned to plaintiff counsel for service. (arw)
September 4, 2020 Standard attachments for District Judge Barbara B. Crabb required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (arw)
September 4, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer. (arw)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Barry Alan Schultz for Plaintiff Julie A. Sommer. (Schultz, Barry)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2738521) filed by Julie A. Sommer. (Attachments: #1 AC decision, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Schultz, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sommer, Julie v. Saul, Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Albert Bianchi, Jr.
Represented By: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jean Godfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie A. Sommer
Represented By: Barry Alan Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?