Kurth, Scott v. Saul, Andrew
Plaintiff: Scott Kurth
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv00809
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Peter A Oppeneer
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Megan Hugo for Defendant Andrew Saul. (Hugo, Megan)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Andrew Saul served on 9/11/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. (Duncan, Dana)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. Materials returned to plaintiff's counsel for service. (kwf)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** From the affidavit of indigency plaintiff has submitted, I find that plaintiff is unable to prepay the fees and costs of commencing this action or to give security therefor. Accordingly, plaintiff's petition for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee is granted. The clerk of court shall issue summonses and forward them to plaintiff's counsel for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/4/2020. (kwf)
September 4, 2020 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
September 4, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (kwf)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Scott Kurth. (Duncan, Dana)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul., filed by Scott Kurth. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Duncan, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kurth, Scott v. Saul, Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Albert Bianchi, Jr.
Represented By: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Megan Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Kurth
Represented By: Dana W. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?