Favatella, Nick et al v. AmGUARD Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Nick Favatella and Carol Favatella
Defendant: AmGUARD Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00815
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 12/4/2020. Dispositive Motions due 9/20/2021. Settlement Letters due 1/7/2022. Motions in Limine due 1/14/2022. Response to Motion due 1/28/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 2/28/2022 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/21/2020. (rks)
October 21, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 10/20/2020 [:10] (cak)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 Brief in Reply by Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company in Support of #7 Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). (Jacobson, Craig) Modified on 10/14/2020. (lak)
October 8, 2020 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 10/09/2020 at 01:00 PM rescheduled to 10/20/2020 at 02:30 PM to accommodate the court's calendar. Counsel for the Plaintiff remains responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. (cak)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Jacobson, Craig)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs Carol Favatella, Nick Favatella re: #7 Motion to Dismiss filed by AmGUARD Insurance Company (Graff, Ryan)
September 14, 2020 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2020 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 Brief in Support of #7 Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Favatella Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Policy, #3 Exhibit 3 - Greystone Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Pretrial Order) (Jacobson, Craig) Modified on 9/14/2020. (lak)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company. Brief in Opposition due 10/2/2020. Brief in Reply due 10/13/2020. (Jacobson, Craig)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Geoffrey J. Repo for Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Repo, Geoffrey)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #4 Motion to Admit Geoffrey J. Repo Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/8/2020. (lak)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to Admit Geoffrey J. Repo Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2743713.) by Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Repo, Geoffrey)
September 8, 2020 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (rks)
September 8, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (rks)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Craig Jacobson for Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Jacobson, Craig)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Brown, Ryan)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Dane County, case number 2020CV001566. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2742950), filed by AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service of Process Transmittal, Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket Sheet, #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Brown, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Favatella, Nick et al v. AmGUARD Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Favatella
Represented By: Ryan Ray Graff
Represented By: Joshua Michael Greatsinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Favatella
Represented By: Ryan Ray Graff
Represented By: Joshua Michael Greatsinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmGUARD Insurance Company
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Brown
Represented By: Craig Jacobson
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Repo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?