Solidstrip, Inc. v. U.S. Technology Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Solidstrip, Inc.
Defendant: Raymond F. Williams, Daryl Duncan, Anthony Giancola, Mark E. Cundiff, U.S. Technology Corporation, Penny Duncan, Missouri Green Materials and U.S. Technology Media Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00822
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants U.S. Technology Corporation answer and Raymond F. Williams answer due 11/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/26/2020. (arw)
October 23, 2020 Filing 19 Supplement re: #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants U.S. Technology Corporation, Raymond F. Williams. (Mills, Laura) Modified on 10/23/2020. (lak).
October 22, 2020 Filing 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants U.S. Technology Corporation, Raymond F. Williams. Response due 10/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Mills, Laura) Modified on 10/22/2020. (lak)
October 22, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance filed by Laura L. Mills for Defendants U.S. Technology Corporation, Raymond F. Williams. (Mills, Laura)
October 19, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Anthony Giancola answer due 11/12/2020; U.S. Technology Media Corporation answer due 11/12/2020. (voc)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Stipulation (Dkt. #15 ) accepted, extension granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/19/2020. (voc)
October 18, 2020 Filing 15 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Defendants Anthony Giancola, U.S. Technology Media Corporation. (Lowther, Joshua)
October 14, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Joshua Sabert Lowther for Defendants Anthony Giancola, U.S. Technology Media Corporation. (Lowther, Joshua)
September 24, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Reissued as to Defendant Raymond F. Williams. (voc)
September 24, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Reissued as to Defendant Mark E. Cundiff. (voc)
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Solidstrip, Inc.. (Cook, Gerard)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Solidstrip, Inc.. (Cook, Gerard)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Solidstrip, Inc.. (Hansen, Timothy)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 Exhibit to #1 Complaint,, filed by Solidstrip, Inc. Exhibit E - UST Indictment (Hansen, Timothy)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 Exhibit to #1 Complaint,, filed by Solidstrip, Inc. Exhibit D - Missouri Case 17-CV-189 Docket Sheet (Hansen, Timothy)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 Exhibit to #1 Complaint,, filed by Solidstrip, Inc. Exhibit C - Cundiff Plea Agreement (Hansen, Timothy)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 Exhibit to #1 Complaint,, filed by Solidstrip, Inc. Exhibit B - UST Plea Agreement (Hansen, Timothy)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 Exhibit to #1 Complaint,, filed by Solidstrip, Inc. Exhibit A - Williams Plea Agreement (Hansen, Timothy)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mark E. Cundiff, Daryl Duncan, Penny Duncan, Anthony Giancola, Missouri Green Materials, U.S. Technology Corporation, U.S. Technology Media Corporation, Raymond F. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Summons Raymond F. Williams, #2 Summons U.S. Technology Media Corporation, #3 Summons Anthony Giancola, #4 Summons Mark E. Cundiff, #5 Summons Missouri Green Materials, #6 Summons Daryl Duncan, #7 Summons Penny Duncan) (voc)
September 9, 2020 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (voc)
September 9, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 Disregard. Modified on 9/9/2020. (lak)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2744151.), filed by Solidstrip, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to U.S. Technology Corporation, #4 Summons to Raymond Williams, #5 Summons to U.S. Technology Media Corporation, #6 Summons to Anthony Giancola, #7 Summons to Mark Cundiff, #8 Summons to Missouri Green Materials, #9 Summons to Daryl Duncan, #10 Summons to Penny Duncan) (Hansen, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solidstrip, Inc. v. U.S. Technology Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond F. Williams
Represented By: Laura L. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Giancola
Represented By: Joshua Sabert Lowther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark E. Cundiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Technology Corporation
Represented By: Laura L. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Green Materials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Technology Media Corporation
Represented By: Joshua Sabert Lowther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solidstrip, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah E. Troupis Ferguson
Represented By: Timothy Michael Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?