Hillstrom, Trevor v. Genesis Financial & Payment Systems Wisconsin, LLC
Plaintiff: Trevor Hillstrom
Defendant: Genesis Financial & Payment Systems Wisconsin, LLC doing business as USA Web Cash
Case Number: 3:2020cv00827
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1693
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2020 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (arw)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice (Crandall, Eric)
September 23, 2020 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2020 at 01:00 PM rescheduled to 10/20/2020 at 02:30 PM to accommodate the calendar of the attorney for the defendant. Counsel for the Plaintiff remains responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. (cak)
September 15, 2020 Set Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2020 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. #Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached. (arw)
September 15, 2020 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
September 15, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER by Defendant Genesis Financial & Payment Systems Wisconsin, LLC. (Cornetta, Matthew)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Douglas County Circuit Court, case number 2020cv000117. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2744928), filed by Genesis Financial & Payment Systems Wisconsin, LLC. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings) (Cornetta, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillstrom, Trevor v. Genesis Financial & Payment Systems Wisconsin, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Financial & Payment Systems Wisconsin, LLC doing business as USA Web Cash
Represented By: Matthew John Cornetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Hillstrom
Represented By: Eric Leighton Crandall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?