Hanson, Troy v. Collection Acquisition Company Inc.
Plaintiff: Troy Hanson
Defendant: Collection Acquisition Company Inc. doing business as Payliance
Case Number: 3:2020cv00829
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (kwf)
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Troy Hanson (Lein, Matthew)
October 7, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Settlement by Plaintiff Troy Hanson (Lein, Matthew)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed. Collection Acquisition Company Inc. served on 9/30/2020, answer due 10/21/2020. (Lein, Matthew)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Collection Acquisition Company Inc. (kwf)
September 11, 2020 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
September 11, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Collection Acquisition Company Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2745356.), filed by Troy Hanson. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Corporate Record, #3 Exhibit Metro Fax letter 8/26/2019, #4 Exhibit Credit Report, #5 Summons) (Lein, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanson, Troy v. Collection Acquisition Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Hanson
Represented By: Matthew Curtiss Lein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collection Acquisition Company Inc. doing business as Payliance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?