Canfield, Sherrill v. Credit One Bank
Plaintiff: Sherrill Canfield
Defendant: Credit One Bank
Case Number: 3:2020cv00837
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #5 Stipulation for Enlargement of Time for Defendant, Credit One Bank, to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Credit One Bank answer due 11/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/14/2020. (arw)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 Stipulation for Enlargement of Time for Defendant, Credit One Bank, to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Credit One Bank. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Van Schyndle, Eric)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Eric James Van Schyndle for Defendant Credit One Bank. (Van Schyndle, Eric)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Credit One Bank. (arw)
September 16, 2020 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (arw)
September 16, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Larry P. Smith for Plaintiff Sherrill Canfield. (Smith, Larry)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Credit One Bank. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2745786) filed by Sherrill Canfield. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Marco, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canfield, Sherrill v. Credit One Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit One Bank
Represented By: Eric James Van Schyndle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrill Canfield
Represented By: Larry P. Smith
Represented By: David Michael Marco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?