Honorato v. Mt. Olympus Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vanessa Honorato
Defendant: Mt. Olympus Enterprises, Inc., Mount Olympus Resorts, LLC, Mt. Olympus Water & Theme Park and Wisconsin Dells Visitor and Convention Bureau, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00903
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 12/21/2020. Dispositive Motions due 9/13/2021. Settlement Letters due 12/17/2021. Motions in Limine due 12/17/2021. Response to Motion due 1/14/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2022 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 2/7/2022 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/23/2020. (jls)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 11/20/2020 [:15] (cak)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiff Vanessa Honorato (Durkin, Patricia)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Wisconsin Dells Visitor and Convention Bureau, Inc.. (Borton, Austin)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiff's motion for a stay while she seeks reconsideration of the September 29, 2020 transfer order from the Northern District of Illinois (dkt. #36 ) is DENIED. This court will account for the reconsideration motion when setting a schedule at the November 20, 2020 telephonic preliminary pretrial conference. It is important that this case not lose its place in line for trial if it stays in Wisconsin, and it is important for discovery to begin, because this case will go forward somewhere. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/5/2020. (jls)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Reply to Counterclaim by Counter Defendant Vanessa Honorato. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Notice of Filing) (Durkin, Patricia)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Motion to Stay by Plaintiff Vanessa Honorato. Response due 11/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Notice of Motion) (Durkin, Patricia) Modified on 11/4/2020: E-mail sent to counsel re: attachments in entries #53 and #54 . (lak)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Notice of Appearance filed by Patricia Carlson Durkin for Counter Defendant Vanessa Honorato. (Durkin, Patricia)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Notice of Appearance filed by Patricia Carlson Durkin for Plaintiff Vanessa Honorato. (Durkin, Patricia)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2020 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting #49 Stipulation for for Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/14/2020. (jls)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Stipulation for for Substitution of Counsel by Defendant Wisconsin Dells Visitor and Convention Bureau, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Borton, Austin)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Wisconsin Dells Visitor and Convention Bureau, Inc.. (Borton, Austin)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 COUNTERCLAIM against Vanessa Honorato by Mt. Olympus Entities. (Richter, Ward) Modified on 10/13/2020. (lak)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Ward I. Richter re: Defendants Mount Olympus Resorts, LLC, Mt. Olympus Enterprises, Inc., Mt. Olympus Water & Theme Park (Richter, Ward)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Notice of Appearance filed by Austin Blake Borton for Defendant Wisconsin Dells Visitor and Convention Bureau, Inc.. (Borton, Austin)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Exhibit to #43 Answer filed by Mount Olympus Resorts, LLC, Mt. Olympus Enterprises, Inc., Mt. Olympus Water & Theme Park (Richter, Ward)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ANSWER by Defendants Mount Olympus Resorts, LLC, Mt. Olympus Enterprises, Inc., Mt. Olympus Water & Theme Park. (Richter, Ward)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Notice of Appearance filed by Sheila M. Sullivan for Defendants Mount Olympus Resorts, LLC, Mt. Olympus Enterprises, Inc., Mt. Olympus Water & Theme Park. (Sullivan, Sheila)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Notice of Appearance filed by David G. Ress for Defendants Mount Olympus Resorts, LLC, Mt. Olympus Enterprises, Inc., Mt. Olympus Water & Theme Park. (Ress, David)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Mount Olympus Resorts, LLC, Mt. Olympus Enterprises, Inc., Mt. Olympus Water & Theme Park . (Richter, Ward) Modified on 10/5/2020. (lak)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Notice of Appearance filed by Ward I. Richter for Defendants Mount Olympus Resorts, LLC, Mt. Olympus Enterprises, Inc., Mt. Olympus Water & Theme Park. (Richter, Ward)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-03385. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (lak)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TRANSFERRED to the USDC Western District of Wisconsin the electronic record. (sxb, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/29/2020. The Court grants Defendants' motions to transfer venue #10 , #15 and directs the Clerk to transfer the case to the Western District of Wisconsin forthwith under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Plaintiff has presented no arguments that removal was improper or untimely, and therefore her motion to remand #18 is denied. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice(lk, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. On the Court's own Motion, Status hearing set for 9/14/2020 is reset for 10/19/2020 at 9:00 AM. Prior to the conference call, Please click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900 to take you to Judge Kendall's telephone conference login. From there, join conference As Guest, ENTER YOUR NAME, Type the digits in the picture, Click on the Call Me option and fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, we ask that you keep your phone on mute until your case is called. Please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH AND EVERY TIME BEFORE YOU SPEAK.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice. (lk, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file supplemental authority in support of Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #31 is granted. Motion hearing set for 8/26/2020 is stricken.Mailed notice (lk, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vanessa Honorato by Patricia Carlson Durkin (Durkin, Patricia) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Motion by Terrence F. Durkin for presentment of motion for leave to file #31 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 8/26/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Durkin, Terrence) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION by Plaintiff Vanessa Honorato for leave to file (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Durkin, Patricia) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPLY by Vanessa Honorato to MOTION by Plaintiff Vanessa Honorato to remand #18 , Response #25 , response to motion, #24 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint at Law, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing - Reply Brief)(Durkin, Terrence) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE by Wisconsin Dells Visitor and Convention Bureau, Inc. re reply to response to motion #28 (Purcell, Bradford) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPLY by Wisconsin Dells Visitor and Convention Bureau, Inc. to response to motion, #27 , MOTION by Defendant Wisconsin Dells Visitor and Convention Bureau, Inc. to dismiss and/or transfer #15 (Purcell, Bradford) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESPONSE by Vanessa Honorato to MOTION by Defendant Wisconsin Dells Visitor and Convention Bureau, Inc. to dismiss and/or transfer #15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint at Law, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Response to Mount Olympus Defendants Motion to Dismiss, #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing - Response to WDVCB's Motion to Dismiss)(Durkin, Terrence) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE by Wisconsin Dells Visitor and Convention Bureau, Inc. re Response #25 (Purcell, Bradford) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE by Defendant Wisconsin Dells Visitor and Convention Bureau, Inc. to motion to remand #18 , response to motion, #24 (Purcell, Bradford) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE by MT. Olympus Enterprises, Inc., Mount Olympus Resorts, LLC to MOTION by Plaintiff Vanessa Honorato to remand #18 Defendants' MT. Olympus Enterprises, Inc. and MT. Olympus Resorts, LLC's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Kahan, Shimon) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPLY by Defendants MT. Olympus Enterprises, Inc., Mount Olympus Resorts, LLC Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Rule 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss and/or Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Kahan, Shimon) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Briefing schedule set as to Defendants Wisconsin Dells Visitor and Convention Bureau, Inc.'s Motion to dismiss and/or transfer #15 and Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #18 . Response due by 7/20/2020. Reply due by 7/27/2020. Status hearing set for 9/14/2020 at 9:00 AM. Motion hearing set for 7/8/2020 and Status hearing set for 9/2/2020 are stricken. Mailed notice (lk, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE by Vanessa Honorato to MOTION by Defendants Mount Olympus Resorts, LLC, MT. Olympus Enterprises, Inc. to dismiss DEFENDANTS' RULE 12(b)(2) MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404 #10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint at Law, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing - Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss)(Durkin, Terrence) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Terrence F. Durkin for presentment of motion for leave to appear #17 , motion to remand #18 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/8/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Durkin, Terrence) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION by Plaintiff Vanessa Honorato to remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Durkin, Terrence) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Appearance MOTION by Plaintiff Vanessa Honorato for leave to appear as Limited Appearance (Durkin, Terrence) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE by Wisconsin Dells Visitor and Convention Bureau, Inc. re MOTION by Defendant Wisconsin Dells Visitor and Convention Bureau, Inc. to dismiss and/or transfer #15 (Purcell, Bradford) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant Wisconsin Dells Visitor and Convention Bureau, Inc. to dismiss and/or transfer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Purcell, Bradford) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendant Wisconsin Dells Visitor and Convention Bureau, Inc.'s Motion for extension of time to file responsive pleading #12 is granted. Answer shall be filed by 7/1/2020. Motion hearing set for 6/24/2020 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Dustin James Karrison for presentment of extension of time #12 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/24/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Karrison, Dustin) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Wisconsin Dells Visitor and Convention Bureau, Inc. for extension of time (Karrison, Dustin) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Briefing schedule set as to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #10 . Response due by 7/1/2020. Reply due by 7/8/2020. Status hearing set for 9/2/2020 at 9:00 AM. The courtroom deputy will contact parties if hearing will proceed via Teleconference. Mailed notice (lk, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION by Defendants Mount Olympus Resorts, LLC, MT. Olympus Enterprises, Inc. to dismiss DEFENDANTS' RULE 12(b)(2) MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Kahan, Shimon) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE by Wisconsin Dells Visitor and Convention Bureau, Inc. re MOTION by Defendant Wisconsin Dells Visitor and Convention Bureau, Inc. to join co-defendants' Notice of Removal #8 (Karrison, Dustin) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Wisconsin Dells Visitor and Convention Bureau, Inc. to join co-defendants' Notice of Removal (Karrison, Dustin) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wisconsin Dells Visitor and Convention Bureau, Inc. by Kolton Allen Reed (Reed, Kolton) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wisconsin Dells Visitor and Convention Bureau, Inc. by Dustin James Karrison (Karrison, Dustin) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wisconsin Dells Visitor and Convention Bureau, Inc. by Bradford Scott Purcell (Purcell, Bradford) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 E-MAILED NOTICE of removal letter to Terrence Durkin (las, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants MT. Olympus Enterprises, Inc., MT. Olympus Water & Theme Park, Mount Olympus Resorts, LLC by Shimon Ben Kahan (Kahan, Shimon) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2020-L-005182) filed by MT. Olympus Enterprises, Inc., MT. Olympus Water & Theme Park, Mount Olympus Resorts, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17092754. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Kahan, Shimon) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (rc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/29/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Honorato v. Mt. Olympus Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mt. Olympus Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Shimon Ben Kahan
Represented By: David G. Ress
Represented By: Sheila M. Sullivan
Represented By: Ward I. Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Olympus Resorts, LLC
Represented By: Shimon Ben Kahan
Represented By: David G. Ress
Represented By: Sheila M. Sullivan
Represented By: Ward I. Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mt. Olympus Water & Theme Park
Represented By: Shimon Ben Kahan
Represented By: David G. Ress
Represented By: Sheila M. Sullivan
Represented By: Ward I. Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Dells Visitor and Convention Bureau, Inc.
Represented By: Kolton Allen Reed
Represented By: Bradford Scott Purcell
Represented By: Dustin James Karrison
Represented By: Austin Blake Borton
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Leavell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Honorato
Represented By: Patricia Carlson Durkin
Represented By: Terrence F. Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?