Szydel, Clayton et al v. Kurkiewicz, Walter et al
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Department of Health Services, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Security Health Plan of Wisconsin, Inc. and Clayton Szydel
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and Walter Kurkiewicz
Case Number: 3:2020cv00916
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Before the court is plaintiff Clayton Szydel's motion to dismiss his claims without prejudice. (Dkt. #10 .) Both defendants have indicated that they do not oppose the motion. (Dkt. # #13 , #16 .) As such, this motion is GRANTED AS UNOPOSED. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/5/2020. (rks)
November 4, 2020 Filing 16 Response Stating No Opposition by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company re: #10 Motion to Dismiss. (Klinner, Mark) Modified on 11/4/2020. (lak)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #14 Stipulation for An Extension of the United States' Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/27/2020. (rks)
October 23, 2020 Filing 14 Stipulation for An Extension of the United States' Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Walter Kurkiewicz. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Suenram, Christopher)
October 23, 2020 Filing 13 Response Stating No Opposition by Defendant Walter Kurkiewicz re: #10 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Clayton Szydel (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Suenram, Christopher)
October 16, 2020 Filing 12 Notice by Plaintiff Wisconsin Department of Health Services Notice of Lien. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service DHS Certificate of Service) (Schuh, Dennis)
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Dennis C. Schuh for Plaintiff Wisconsin Department of Health Services. (Schuh, Dennis)
October 16, 2020 Set Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 1/5/2021 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. #Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached. (arw)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS by Plaintiff Clayton Szydel. Brief in Opposition due 11/4/2020. Brief in Reply due 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Certification of Scope of Employment) (Welch, Benjamin) Modified on 10/14/2020: E-mail sent to counsel re: exhibit descriptions. (lak)
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Security Health Plan of Wisconsin, Inc.. (Boero, Lisa)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Klinner, Mark)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 Notice by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, State Farm's Reply to Cross-Claim of Security Health Plan. (Klinner, Mark)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Klinner, Mark)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #3 GRANTED IN PART: in the absence of a stipulated extension, the government's deadline to answer or otherwise respond is extended 30 days. Answer due 11/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/5/2020. (voc)
October 5, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
October 5, 2020 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance and Substitution of Counsel filed by Leslie K. Herje for Defendant Walter Kurkiewicz. (Herje, Leslie)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Walter Kurkiewicz. Response due 10/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Suenram, Christopher)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Notice by Defendant Walter Kurkiewicz of Substitution of the United States as Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Suenram, Christopher)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Taylor County Circuit Court, case number 2020CV000063., filed by Walter Kurkiewicz. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Scope of Employment, #2 State Court Documents, #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service) (Suenram, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Szydel, Clayton et al v. Kurkiewicz, Walter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Department of Health Services
Represented By: Dennis C. Schuh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Represented By: Timothy Michael O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Security Health Plan of Wisconsin, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa H. Boero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Szydel
Represented By: Jerome A. Maeder
Represented By: Benjamin Charles Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark A. Klinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Kurkiewicz
Represented By: Leslie K. Herje
Represented By: Christopher Francis Suenram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?