McGowan v. Camp Agawak, LTD et al
Plaintiff: David McGowan
Defendant: Mary Fried and Camp Agawak, LTD
Case Number: 3:2020cv00961
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Set Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2020 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. #Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached. (arw)
October 16, 2020 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
October 16, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
October 16, 2020 Filing 48 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-01532. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (arw)
October 16, 2020 Filing 47 TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Wisconsin the electronic record.(gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
October 1, 2020 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 10/1/2020. Mailed notice(gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: Defendants' motion to dismiss for improper venue #13 is denied and the motion to transfer [13-2] is granted. The court does not address the motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction [13-1] and it is denied as moot. This case is hereby transferred to the Western District of Wisconsin pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a). Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 10/1/2020. Mailed notice(gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk4, Docket) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket5, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 42 STATUS Report (Joint) by Camp Agawak, LTD, Mary Fried (Smiricky, Stacey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket4, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket12, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (td, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:Status hearing set for 3/17/2020 is stricken. The Court will rule by mail on Defendants' motion to dismiss, or alternatively, to transfer #13 . (rao, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE by Tess Godhardt of Change of Address / Change of Firm Name (Godhardt, Tess) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE by David McGowan of Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's First Request to Produce to Camp Agawak, Ltd.; Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Camp Agawak, Ltd.; Plaintiff's First Request to Produce to Mary Fried; and Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Mary Fried (Mathias, Megan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE by Stacey Lynn Smiricky of Change of Address / Change Firm Name (Smiricky, Stacey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendants' counsel reported that the parties did not settle. The status hearing set for 12/20/2020 is stricken and reset to 3/17/2020 at 10:15 a.m. The Court will rule by mail on Defendants' motion to dismiss #13 . (rao, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 33 JOINT JURISDICTIONAL STATEMENT by Camp Agawak, LTD, Mary Fried (St. Clair, Sylvia) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:Status hearing held on 11/20/2019 and continued to 12/20/2019 at 9:45 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint jurisdictional statement by 11/27/2019. Plaintiff to submit a written settlement demand by 12/5/2019. Defendants' response is due by 12/19/2019. (rao, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 31 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by David McGowan (Mathias, Megan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 11/12/2019. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 11/20/2019 at 9:45 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Reassignment Status Report) (rao, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: In light of the reassignment of this case to Judge Pacold, all hearings set before this Court are stricken. Mailed notice (ef, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 28 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 19-0025 Pursuant that to the Executive Committee Order entered on August 9, 2019 the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Martha M. Pacold; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 342 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable Martha M. Pacolds webpage on the Courts website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order will not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Martha M. Pacold to the Courts civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Martha M. Pacold to the Courts criminal case assignment system thirty days from the entry of this Order so that she shall receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold for all further proceedings. Honorable Andrea R. Wood no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/23/2019.(las, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing set for 8/21/2019 is stricken and reset for 9/10/2019 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (aw) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: By agreement of the parties, the status hearing set for 8/7/2019 is stricken and reset for 8/21/2019 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing set for 7/9/2019 is stricken and reset for 8/7/2019 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY by Camp Agawak, LTD, Mary Fried to MOTION by Defendants Mary Fried, Camp Agawak, LTD to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , or, AlternativelyMOTION by Defendants Mary Fried, Camp Agawak, LTD to transfer case #13 , response in opposition to motion, #22 (Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smiricky, Stacey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by David McGowan re response in opposition to motion, #22 (Mathias, Megan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE by David McGowanin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Mary Fried, Camp Agawak, LTD to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , or, AlternativelyMOTION by Defendants Mary Fried, Camp Agawak, LTD to transfer case #13 (Mathias, Megan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiff's Uncontested Motion for extension of time to file response/reply #19 is granted. Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss #13 is due by 4/22/2019; Defendant's reply by 5/6/2019. The motion presentment date of 4/18/2019 is stricken; parties need not appear. Status hearing set for 6/4/2019 is stricken and reset for 7/9/2019 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Megan Mae Mathias for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #19 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 4/18/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Mathias, Megan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiff David McGowan for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion hearing,, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings, #16 (Mathias, Megan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing held. As stated on the record, written discovery may be served but the parties' obligations to respond are stayed. Deposition discovery is stayed. The parties' obligations to provide mandatory initial discovery are stricken until further order of Court. Status hearing set for 6/4/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 17 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff David McGowan. (Mathias, Megan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss #13 is due by 4/11/2019; defendant's reply by 4/25/2019. Status hearing remains set for 4/3/2019. Mailed notice (ags, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Stacey Lynn Smiricky for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, motion to transfer case #13 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 3/14/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Smiricky, Stacey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by Camp Agawak, LTD, Mary Fried in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, motion to transfer case #13 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mary Fried)(Smiricky, Stacey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendants Mary Fried, Camp Agawak, LTD to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , or, Alternatively, MOTION by Defendants Mary Fried, Camp Agawak, LTD to transfer case (Smiricky, Stacey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David McGowan by Megan Mae Mathias Megan Lopp Mathias (Mathias, Megan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Camp Agawak, LTD, Mary Fried by Sylvia B. St. Clair (St. Clair, Sylvia) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 4/3/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 MAILED notice of removal letter to counsel of record, via email. (ph, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Camp Agawak, LTD, Mary Fried by Benjamin Ryan Prinsen (Prinsen, Benjamin) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF FILING AND SERVICE OF NOTIFICATION OF REMOVAL by Camp Agawak, LTD, Mary Fried (Smiricky, Stacey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Camp Agawak, LTD (Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Smiricky, Stacey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Camp Agawak, LTD, Mary Fried by Tess Godhardt (Godhardt, Tess) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
March 4, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Camp Agawak, LTD, Mary Fried by Stacey Lynn Smiricky (Smiricky, Stacey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Smiricky, Stacey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from The Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2019-M1-103955) filed by Camp Agawak, LTD, Mary Fried Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15549303. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 & 2)(Smiricky, Stacey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGowan v. Camp Agawak, LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Fried
Represented By: Sylvia B. St. Clair
Represented By: Stacey Lynn Smiricky
Represented By: Tess Godhardt
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan Prinsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camp Agawak, LTD
Represented By: Sylvia B. St. Clair
Represented By: Stacey Lynn Smiricky
Represented By: Tess Godhardt
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan Prinsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David McGowan
Represented By: Megan Mae Mathias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?