Williams v. Kinyon et al
Plaintiff: Travis Delaney Williams and Travis D. Williams
Defendant: Julia Payne, Andrea Titlbach, Jamie Adams, Nurse Sheryl Kinyon, J. Hill, Sandra McArdle, John Doe, Danielle Hagan and Erin Whirle
Not Classified By Court: WSPF Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2020cv01021
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Filing 46 Declaration of Travis D. Williams filed by Plaintiff Travis Delaney Williams re: #45 Proposed Amended Complaint, #44 Motion for Leave to File (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TDW 00A - Progress Notes, #2 Exhibit TDW 00B - Inmate Complaint WSPF-2019-11507, #3 Exhibit 32 - ICE Report WSPF-2019-11507, #4 Exhibit 33 - ICE Rejection WSPF-2019-11621, #5 Exhibit 34 - ICE Rejection WSPF-2017-27634, #6 Exhibit 35 - Office of Secretary Decision WSPF-2019-15361, #7 Exhibit 985 and 986 - Progress Notes, #8 1011 and 1012 - Progress Notes) (aom),(ps)
January 5, 2021 Filing 45 Proposed Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Travis Delaney Williams. (aom),(ps)
January 5, 2021 Filing 44 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Travis Delaney Williams. (aom),(ps)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** In the event that later in this lawsuit the defendants wish to depose the plaintiff, then pursuant to F.R. Civ. Pro. 30(a)(2)(B), permission to conduct this deposition is granted in advance, so that defendants do not need to file a motion asking for permission at that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/18/2020. (jef),(ps)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Dispositive Motions for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies due 1/22/2021. Dispositive Motions due 5/28/2021. Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures and all motions in limine due 10/22/2021. Objections due 11/5/2021. Telephone Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2021 at 10:00 AM. Counsel for Defendants responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5087. Jury Selection and Trial set for 12/6/2021 at 08:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/18/2020. (jef),(ps)
December 18, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference - Pro Se held on 12/18/2020 [:20] (cak),(ps)
December 15, 2020 Filing 41 Copy of #39 Letter from Plaintiff regarding Pretrial Conference by Plaintiff Travis Delaney Williams. (aom),(ps)
December 7, 2020 Filing 40 Clerk's office response to plaintiff's #39 letter. (nln),(ps)
December 7, 2020 Filing 39 Letter from Plaintiff regarding Pretrial Conference. (aom),(ps)
December 4, 2020 Filing 38 Notice of Appearance filed by Laure C. Rakvic-Farr for Defendants Jamie Adams, Sheryl Kinyon, Erin Whirle. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Rakvic-Farr, Laure),(ps)
December 4, 2020 Filing 37 Letter from Plaintiff Travis Williams inquiring about preliminary pretrial telephone conference call originally set for December 3. Clerk's office note: Plaintiff's letter crossed in the mail with the NEF rescheduling the preliminary pretrial telephone conference call to December 18, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. (nln),(ps)
December 3, 2020 Reset Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference rescheduled to 12/18/2020 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Wisconsin DOJ responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Notice Regarding the Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (nln),(ps)
November 9, 2020 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 12/3/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for the State Defendants responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Notice Regarding the Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jef),(ps)
November 9, 2020 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley. (jef),(ps)
November 9, 2020 Filing 36 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00707. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (lak)
November 9, 2020 Case Electronically Transmitted to the Western District of Wisconsin on November 9, 2020. (cav) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 11/9/2020 granting #19 Motion to Change Venue. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(Griesbach, William) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
November 9, 2020 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sandra McArdle re Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Change Venue (Kallies, Thomas) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
November 6, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Sandra McArdle re #19 MOTION to Change Venue . (Kallies, Thomas) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
November 6, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Jamie Adams, Sheryl Kinyon, Sandra McArdle, Erin Whirle re #19 MOTION to Change Venue . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jaber, Samir) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ONLY ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to file a response by November 6, 2020 to #19 Motion to Change Venue filed by Travis Delaney Williams, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 10/23/2020. (cc: all counsel via efile; Williams via U.S. Mail)(Griesbach, William) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
October 19, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C Kallies on behalf of Sandra McArdle. Attorney(s) appearing: Thomas C. Kallies (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Reid, John) Modified on 10/19/2020 (tlf). [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 10/13/2020. Discovery due by 2/10/2021. Motions due by 3/12/2021. (cc: all counsel and via U.S. Mail to Travis Delaney Williams)(Griesbach, William) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to Prisoner Complaint by Sandra McArdle.(Reid, John) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 27 DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED. ANSWER to Prisoner Complaint by Sandra McArdle.(Reid, John) Modified on 10/13/2020 (tlf). [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 26 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sandra McArdle. (Reid, John) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by John J Reid on behalf of Sandra McArdle. Attorney(s) appearing: John J. Reid (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Reid, John) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Substitution of counsel by Samir S Jaber on behalf of Jamie Adams, Sheryl Kinyon, Erin Whirle. Attorney(s) appearing: Samir S. Jaber and Laure Rakvic-Farr (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jaber, Samir) Modified event text on 10/13/2020 (lh). [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sandra McArdle - Waiver sent on 9/29/2020. (Reid, John) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to Prisoner Complaint with Jury Demand by Jamie Adams, Sheryl Kinyon, Erin Whirle.(Peacock, Ann) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 21 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY DOJ as to Jamie Adams, Sheryl Kinyon, Erin Whirle (Peacock, Ann) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann M Peacock on behalf of Jamie Adams, Sheryl Kinyon, Erin Whirle. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Peacock, Ann) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Change Venue by Travis Delaney Williams. (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 18 TRANSMIT Complaint, Order, Notice, Waiver to USMS for service as to Sandra McArdle. (cav) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee, denying as moot #14 MOTION for Relief filed by Travis Delaney Williams, J Hill, Julia Payne, Andrea Titlbach, John Doe (Officer at WSPF) and Danielle Hagan are dismissed. The United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint and this order upon defendant Sandra McArdle. (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Williams and Warden)(Griesbach, William) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER from Travis Williams inquiring if the initial partial filing fee was received. (Copy of financial entry NEF dated 7/13/2020 mailed to Williams) (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
July 13, 2020 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $3.00, receipt number MK4689-083170. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (cmb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Travis D Williams Authenticating Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Relief of Judgment by Travis Delaney Williams. (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 6/19/2020 denying #11 Motion for Reconsideration. Initial partial filing fee of $2.16 due by 7/24/2020. (cc: all counsel and via U.S. Mail to Travis Delaney Williams) (Griesbach, William) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Travis D Williams Authenticating Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3)(mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Reconsideration by Travis Delaney Williams. (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that within 21 days plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $2.16 as an initial partial filing fee in this action, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 6/1/2020. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to Williams and Warden)(Griesbach, William) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT by Travis Delaney Williams re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Travis Delaney Williams. (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Sent to Travis Delaney Williams Returned as Undeliverable re #6 Letter (From Court) Re-issued to Travis Delaney Williams at WSPF on 5/26/2020 (lh) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER from the Clerk to Travis Delaney Williams in response to #5 Request for e-filing receipts and discovery deadline information for Case 19-C-1159 (filed in 20-C-707). (cc: All Counsel) (tlf) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST by Travis Delaney Williams for e-filing receipts. (cmb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Travis Delaney Williams. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (cmb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Travis D Williams re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee and Declaration by Travis Delaney Williams. (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Travis Delaney Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/9/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Kinyon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Delaney Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Titlbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Adams
Represented By: Samir S Jaber
Represented By: Ann M. Peacock
Represented By: Laure C. Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Samir Sadoun Jaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Sheryl Kinyon
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Represented By: Samir S Jaber
Represented By: Ann M. Peacock
Represented By: Laure C. Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Samir Sadoun Jaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra McArdle
Represented By: Thomas C Kallies
Represented By: John J. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Whirle
Represented By: Samir S Jaber
Represented By: Ann M. Peacock
Represented By: Laure C. Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Samir Sadoun Jaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WSPF Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?