Ford, Alexander v. Financial Recovery Services Inc
Plaintiff: Alexander Ford
Defendant: Financial Recovery Services Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv01023
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 1/12/2021. (lak)
December 21, 2020 Set Telephone Pretrials Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2021 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc)
December 18, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER by Defendant Financial Recovery Services Inc. (Poncin, Michael)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting #6 Stipulation for Extension to Respond to Complaint. Financial Recovery Services Inc answer due 12/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/4/2020. (jls)
December 4, 2020 Filing 6 Stipulation for Extension to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Financial Recovery Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Poncin, Michael)
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Financial Recovery Services Inc. (Poncin, Michael)
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael S. Poncin for Defendant Financial Recovery Services Inc. (Poncin, Michael)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Financial Recovery Services Inc. (jls)
November 12, 2020 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jls)
November 12, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
November 11, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Alexander Ford. (DeLadurantey, Nathan)
November 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Financial Recovery Services Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2781570.), filed by Alexander Ford. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (DeLadurantey, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford, Alexander v. Financial Recovery Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Recovery Services Inc
Represented By: Michael S. Poncin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Ford
Represented By: Nathan Edward DeLadurantey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?