Creando Little Language Explorers, LLC v. Monroe Street Arts Center, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Creando Little Language Explorers, LLC
Defendant: Tara Verma, Jamie Gale, Monroe Street Arts Center, Inc. and Creative Soul Club
Case Number: 3:2020cv01051
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **At a January 13, 2021 telephonic status conference, the court set jury selection and trial for June 20, 2022 at 9:00 in the event the court does not grant the pending motion to remand. If remand is denied, then we will reconvene telephonically to set the rest of the schedule. Due to the pending motion for remand (and to a lesser extent, the pending dismissal motion), the court stayed discovery until April 30, 2021. The parties had no other substantive matters to bring to the court's attention. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/13/2021. (voc)
January 11, 2021 Filing 15 Declaration of Douglas M. Poland filed by Defendants Creative Soul Club, Jamie Gale, Monroe Street Arts Center, Inc., Tara Verma re: #9 Motion to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript of 11-11-20 status conference, #2 Exhibit Creando web page 11-11-20, #3 Exhibit US Copyright Office Circular 66) (Poland, Douglas)
January 11, 2021 Filing 14 Brief in Opposition by Defendants Creative Soul Club, Jamie Gale, Monroe Street Arts Center, Inc., Tara Verma re: #9 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Creando Little Language Explorers, LLC (Poland, Douglas)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Defendants' motion #12 to stay their deadline to answer pending a ruling on plaintiff's motion to remand is granted. The January 13, 2021 telephonic preliminary pretrial conference is converted to a telephonic status conference at which we will discuss discovery in general and set a trial date as a placeholder. The parties are excused from submitting a Rule 26(f) report at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/4/2021. (arw)
December 30, 2020 Filing 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Until Resolution of Plaintiff's Pending Motion to Remand by Defendants Creative Soul Club, Jamie Gale, Monroe Street Arts Center, Inc., Tara Verma. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 1/6/2021. (Poland, Douglas)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Plaintiffs have filed an amended complaint, (dkt. #7 ), which eliminates their Lanham Act claim and appears to otherwise address some of the issues in defendants' pending motion to dismiss (dkt. #2 ). In light of this new, operative complaint, defendants are directed either to: (1) file a new motion to dismiss or responsive pleading to plaintiffs' amended complaint on or before January 11, 2021; or (2) on or before January 11, 2021, notify the court that they intend to stand on their original motion, in which case the court will redirect the pending motion toward the newly-operative complaint. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/22/2020. (voc)
December 21, 2020 Filing 10 Brief in Support of #9 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Creando Little Language Explorers, LLC (West, Travis)
December 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO REMAND to State Court by Plaintiff Creando Little Language Explorers, LLC. Brief in Opposition due 1/11/2021. Brief in Reply due 1/21/2021. (West, Travis)
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Creando Little Language Explorers, LLC. (West, Travis)
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Creando Little Language Explorers, LLC. (West, Travis)
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 Declaration of Seep Paliwal filed by Defendants Creative Soul Club, Jamie Gale, Monroe Street Arts Center, Inc., Tara Verma re: #2 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPTO registration number 4563155, #2 Exhibit Specimen of registered mark) (Poland, Douglas)
December 1, 2020 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2021 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc)
November 30, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Creative Soul Club, Jamie Gale, Monroe Street Arts Center, Inc., Tara Verma. (Poland, Douglas)
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 Disregard, refiled as #6 Declaration of Seep Paliwal. Modified on 12/1/2020. (lak/arw)
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 Brief in Support of #2 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Creative Soul Club, Jamie Gale, Monroe Street Arts Center, Inc., Tara Verma (Poland, Douglas)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendants Creative Soul Club, Jamie Gale, Monroe Street Arts Center, Inc., Tara Verma. Brief in Opposition due 12/21/2020. Brief in Reply due 12/31/2020. (Poland, Douglas)
November 20, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
November 20, 2020 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dane County Circuit Court, case number 2020CV002173. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2785553), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State court documents, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Removal, #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Poland, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creando Little Language Explorers, LLC v. Monroe Street Arts Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Verma
Represented By: Douglas Maynard Poland
Represented By: Seep Paliwal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Gale
Represented By: Douglas Maynard Poland
Represented By: Seep Paliwal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe Street Arts Center, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Maynard Poland
Represented By: Seep Paliwal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creative Soul Club
Represented By: Douglas Maynard Poland
Represented By: Seep Paliwal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Creando Little Language Explorers, LLC
Represented By: Benoit Marc Letendre
Represented By: Travis James West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?