Luna Vanegas, Jose v. Signet Builders, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jose Ageo Luna Vanegas
Defendant: Signet Builders, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00054
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #23 Motion to Admit Lorraine Gaynor Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 3/18/2021. (lak)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge update in case. Case randomly reassigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Motion to Admit Lorraine Gaynor Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2845061.) by Plaintiff Jose Ageo Luna Vanegas. (Gaynor, Lorraine)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time. Brief in Opposition due 4/7/2021. Brief in Reply due 4/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/17/2021. (jls)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification by Defendant Signet Builders, Inc.. Response due 3/24/2021. (Boehm, Edward)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiff Jose Ageo Luna Vanegas for Jose Luis Garcia Gonzalez (Zimmermann, Jennifer)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 3/22/2021. (lak)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Declaration of Jose Ageo Luna Vanegas filed by Plaintiff Jose Ageo Luna Vanegas re: #15 Motion for Conditional Certification of Class (Sweitzer-Beckman, Erica)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Declaration of Benjamin R. Botts filed by Plaintiff Jose Ageo Luna Vanegas re: #15 Motion for Conditional Certification of Class (Sweitzer-Beckman, Erica)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Declaration of Erica Sweitzer-Beckman filed by Plaintiff Jose Ageo Luna Vanegas re: #15 Motion for Conditional Certification of Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sampling of Signet 2019 Job Orders, #2 Exhibit Sampling of Signet 2020 job orders, #3 Exhibit Proposed Notice and Consent Form) (Sweitzer-Beckman, Erica)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Brief in Support of #15 Motion for Conditional Certification of Class by Plaintiff Jose Ageo Luna Vanegas (Sweitzer-Beckman, Erica)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Motion for Conditional Certification of Class by Plaintiff Jose Ageo Luna Vanegas. Brief in Opposition due 4/2/2021. Brief in Reply due 4/12/2021. (Sweitzer-Beckman, Erica)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #9 Motion to Admit Joshua H. Viau Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion to Admit Edward N. Boehm, Jr., Pro Hac Vice; granting #11 Motion to Admit Ann Margaret Pointer Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 3/11/2021. (lak)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Signet Builders, Inc. answer due 4/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/10/2021. (voc)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Signet Builders, Inc.. Response due 3/17/2021. (Boehm, Edward)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Motion to Admit Ann Margaret Pointer Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2841246.) by Defendant Signet Builders, Inc.. (Pointer, Ann) (Main Document 11 replaced on 3/10/2021) (jls).
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Motion to Admit Edward N. Boehm, Jr Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2840673.) by Defendant Signet Builders, Inc.. (Boehm, Edward) (Main Document 10 replaced on 3/10/2021) (jls).
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Motion to Admit Joshua H Viau Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2840539.) by Defendant Signet Builders, Inc.. (Viau, Joshua)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Signet Builders, Inc. served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021. (Zimmermann, Jennifer)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Signet Builders, Inc. (jls)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Jose Ageo Luna Vanegas. (Zimmermann, Jennifer)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Erica Lynn Sweitzer-Beckman for Plaintiff Jose Ageo Luna Vanegas. (Sweitzer-Beckman, Erica)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Signet Builders, Inc. (jls)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Jose Ageo Luna Vanegas. (Zimmermann, Jennifer)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Signet Builders, Inc. (jls)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jls)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Signet Builders, Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2817353.), filed by Jose Ageo Luna Vanegas. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff Consent Form) (Zimmermann, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luna Vanegas, Jose v. Signet Builders, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Ageo Luna Vanegas
Represented By: Jennifer Jean Zimmermann
Represented By: Erica Lynn Sweitzer-Beckman
Represented By: Lorraine Gaynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signet Builders, Inc.
Represented By: Ann Margaret Pointer
Represented By: Joshua H Viau
Represented By: Edward N. Boehm, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?