Heuring, Jodie et al v. Childers, Kenneth et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Heuring and Jodie Heuring
Defendant: Tricare, Kenneth Michael Childers, North Star Mutual Insurance Company, ABC Insurance Company, The Waggoners Trucking and Protective Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00080
Filed: February 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #18 Motion to Admit Stephen M. Warner Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 3/30/2021. (lak)
March 29, 2021 Filing 18 Motion to Admit Stephen M. Warner Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2851015.) by Defendant North Star Mutual Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Warner, Stephen)
March 25, 2021 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2021 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
March 16, 2021 Judge update in case. Case randomly reassigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
March 15, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant North Star Mutual Insurance Company. (Duncan, Gregory)
March 11, 2021 Filing 16 Reply to Counterclaim by Plaintiff Jodie Heuring. (Brose, Michael) Modified on 3/12/2021. (lak)
March 11, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Gregory Heuring, Jodie Heuring. (Brose, Michael)
March 10, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Crossclaim by Defendants Kenneth Michael Childers, Protective Insurance Company, The Waggoners Trucking. (Roberts, Michael)
March 3, 2021 Filing 13 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff as to Defendant Tricare. (Brose, Michael) Modified on 3/11/2021. (lak)
March 3, 2021 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff as to Defendant North Star Mutual Ins Co. (Brose, Michael) Modified on 3/11/2021. (lak)
March 3, 2021 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff as to Defendants Kenneth Michael Childers, The Waggoners Trucking and Protective Insurance. (Brose, Michael) Modified on 3/11/2021. (lak)
March 3, 2021 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff as to Defendant Kenneth Michael Childers, The Waggoners Trucking and Protective Insurance and Electronic Filing Notice. (Brose, Michael) Modified on 3/11/2021. (lak)
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 Acknowledgment of Service Executed on Kenneth Michael Childers filed by Plaintiffs Gregory Heuring, Jodie Heuring. (Brose, Michael)
March 2, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER, CROSSCLAIM against Protective Insurance Company, Kenneth Michael Childers, ABC Insurance Company, The Waggoners Trucking, COUNTERCLAIM against Gregory Heuring, Jodie Heuring by North Star Mutual Insurance Company. (Duncan, Gregory) Modified on 3/3/2021. (lak)
March 2, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Gregory James Duncan for Defendant North Star Mutual Insurance Company. (Duncan, Gregory)
February 9, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendants Kenneth Michael Childers, Protective Insurance Company, The Waggoners Trucking. (Roberts, Michael)
February 4, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Kenneth Roberts for Defendants Kenneth Michael Childers, Protective Insurance Company, The Waggoners Trucking. (Roberts, Michael)
February 4, 2021 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf)
February 4, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
February 3, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Service by Defendants Kenneth Michael Childers, Protective Insurance Company, The Waggoners Trucking as to #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Stanaszak, Steven)
February 3, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Protective Insurance Company. (Stanaszak, Steven)
February 3, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant The Waggoners Trucking. (Stanaszak, Steven)
February 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Juneau County Circuit Court, case number 21-CV-000008. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2823287), filed by Protective Insurance Company, Kenneth Michael Childers, The Waggoners Trucking. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Notice of Appearance, #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Stanaszak, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heuring, Jodie et al v. Childers, Kenneth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Heuring
Represented By: Michael J. Brose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodie Heuring
Represented By: Michael J. Brose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tricare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Michael Childers
Represented By: Steven F. Stanaszak
Represented By: Michael Kenneth Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Star Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen M. Warner
Represented By: Gregory James Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Waggoners Trucking
Represented By: Steven F. Stanaszak
Represented By: Michael Kenneth Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protective Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven F. Stanaszak
Represented By: Michael Kenneth Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?