United States of America v. $4,773.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $4,773.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2021cv00128
Filed: February 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 0881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 Warrant for Arrest in Rem Issued as to $4,773.00 in United States Currency. (kwf)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/3/2021. (kwf)
March 1, 2021 Filing 4 Brief in Support of #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Plaintiff United States of America (Luehring, Heidi)
March 1, 2021 Filing 3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Warrant of Arrest) (Luehring, Heidi)
February 25, 2021 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf)
February 25, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
February 24, 2021 Filing 2 Declaration of Jennifer Neibuhr re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Text Message, #2 Exhibit 2 Text Message, #3 Exhibit 3 Text Message, #4 Exhibit 4 Text Message, #5 Exhibit 5 Text Message) (Luehring, Heidi)
February 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $4,773.00 in United States Currency., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Luehring, Heidi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $4,773.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,773.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Heidi Luehring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?