Thorson, Nancy v. Saul, Andrew
Plaintiff: Nancy Thorson
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2021cv00207
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: Peter A Oppeneer
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed by Defendant Andrew M. Saul. Andrew M. Saul served on 4/23/2021, answer due 6/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (Brzezinski, James)
April 5, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul. Materials returned to plaintiff counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Regional Counsel, #2 Summons - U.S. Attorney's Office) (arw)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Nancy Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Brzezinski, James)
March 29, 2021 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (arw)
March 29, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker and Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer. (arw)
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0758-2849742) filed by Nancy Thorson. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Brzezinski, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thorson, Nancy v. Saul, Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Thorson
Represented By: James Brzezinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Albert Bianchi, Jr.
Represented By: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?