Wallis, Deborah et al v. CTI LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tianna Neal and Deborah Wallis
Defendant: CTI LLC, CSS Corporation, CTI LLC doing business as Customer Traac LLC, Oz Management Group, Inc. doing business as Customer Contact Service, Inc. and CCS Corporation
Case Number: 3:2021cv00290
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Reissued as to Defendants CCS Corporation, CTI LLC. (kwf)
June 23, 2021 Filing 9 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiffs Tianna Neal, Deborah Wallis. (Murshid, Summer)
June 23, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Collective and Class Action Complaint against CTI LLC, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Murshid, Summer)
June 16, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed. CCS Corporation served on 6/2/2021, answer due 6/23/2021. (Murshid, Summer)
May 19, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to CCS Corporation. (kwf)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Collective and Class Action Complaint against CTI LLC, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons CCS Corporation) (Murshid, Summer)
May 3, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiffs Tianna Neal, Deborah Wallis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent form for Opt in Plaintiff J. Guilme, #2 Certificate of Service) (Murshid, Summer)
April 30, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CSS Corporation, CTI LLC. (kwf)
April 30, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
April 30, 2021 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
April 29, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiffs Tianna Neal, Deborah Wallis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent forms for Opt in Plaintiffs B. Hahn, and N. Wilczynski) (Murshid, Summer)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2867883.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Consent form Deborah Wallis, #2 Consent form Tianna Neal, #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons CTI LLC, #5 Summons CSS Corporation) (Murshid, Summer) Modified on 4/30/2021: Changed designation of Customer Traac, LLC from agent to d/b/a. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallis, Deborah et al v. CTI LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTI LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTI LLC doing business as Customer Traac LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oz Management Group, Inc. doing business as Customer Contact Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tianna Neal
Represented By: Summer Hart Murshid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Wallis
Represented By: Summer Hart Murshid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?