Miller, James v. Saul, Andrew
Plaintiff: James K Miller
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2021cv00327
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: Peter A Oppeneer
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Megan Hugo for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Hugo, Megan)
June 23, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Returned Executed. Andrew M. Saul served on 6/7/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (Schultz, Barry)
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed. Andrew M. Saul served on 6/3/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (Schultz, Barry)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed by Defendant Andrew M. Saul. Andrew M. Saul served on 6/1/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (Schultz, Barry)
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul. Materials returned to plaintiff counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons Regional Chief Counsel, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office) (voc)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** From the affidavit of indigency plaintiff has submitted, I find that plaintiff is unable to prepay the fees and costs of commencing this action or to give security therefor. Accordingly, plaintiff's petition for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee is granted. The clerk of court shall issue summonses and forward them to plaintiff's counsel for service. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/17/2021. (voc)
May 17, 2021 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (voc)
May 17, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker and Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (voc)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff James K Miller. (Schultz, Barry)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Barry Alan Schultz for Plaintiff James K Miller. (Schultz, Barry)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by James K Miller. (Attachments: #1 AC decision, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Schultz, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller, James v. Saul, Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Albert Bianchi, Jr.
Represented By: Megan Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James K Miller
Represented By: Barry Alan Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?