Holliman, Shawn v. Webber, Lucas et al
Plaintiff: Shawn Holliman
Defendant: Security Director Gustke B., Correctional Officer L. Johnson, Warden Lucas Weber and C/O Sergent Jane Doe
Not Classified By Court: CCI Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2021cv00341
Filed: May 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Filing 10 Warden PLRA Letter. (kmd),(ps)
June 1, 2021 Partial Filing fee received : $38.14, receipt number 34690038898. (kmd),(ps)
May 26, 2021 Filing 9 Letter from Clerk's Office regarding #8 Letter from Plaintiff regarding unsigned documents. (aom),(ps)
May 25, 2021 Filing 8 Letter from Plaintiff regarding unsigned documents. (Attachments: #1 Interview-Information Request) (aom),(ps)
May 19, 2021 Filing 7 Signed copy of #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Shawn Holliman. (aom),(ps)
May 19, 2021 Filing 6 Signed copy of #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Shawn Holliman. (aom),(ps)
May 19, 2021 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk's Office regarding unsigned #1 Complaint and #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. (aom),(ps)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 38.14 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 6/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 05/19/2021. (aom),(ps)
May 19, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Shawn Holliman (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (aom),(ps)
May 19, 2021 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Shawn Holliman. (Unsigned) * See dkt. #6 for signed copy. (aom),(ps)
May 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Shawn Holliman. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Unsigned) * See dkt. #7 for signed copy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ICE Report Complaint No. CCI-2019-19234, #2 Exhibit B - Office of Secretary Decision Complaint No. CCI-2019-19234, #3 Exhibit C - Inmate Complaint Complaint No. CCI-2019-19234, #4 Exhibit D - Inmate Complaint Appeal Complaint No. CCI-2019-19234) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holliman, Shawn v. Webber, Lucas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Director Gustke B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Lucas Weber
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Sergent Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Holliman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: CCI Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?