Helmueller, Andrew v. Mclain, Jared
Plaintiff: Andrew Jacob Helmueller
Defendant: Jared Mclain
Case Number: 3:2021cv00369
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 Warden PLRA Letter. (aom),(ps)
July 13, 2021 Partial Filing fee received : $ 20.25, receipt number 34690039141 (aom),(ps)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 20.25 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 7/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 06/24/2021. (aom),(ps)
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Andrew Jacob Helmueller (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (aom),(ps)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Andrew Jacob Helmueller. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (aom),(ps)
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 Letter from Andrew Helmueller regarding case. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
June 4, 2021 Filing 4 Letter from clerk's office returning $5.00 check to plaintiff for incorrect amount. (jef),(ps)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 Letter from plaintiff providing a $5.00 check and regarding spelling of defendant's last name. (Attachments: #1 $5 money order, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing plaintiff submit $402 filing fee or a motion for leave to proceed without prepayment and Trust Fund Account Statement by 6/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/3/2021. (jef),(ps)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jared Mclain, filed by Andrew Jacob Helmueller. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb.) (Attachments: #1 Invocation of Rights, #2 AO 91 form Criminal Complaint, #3 Request for Release/Modification/Change in Sentence, #4 Envelope, #5 Envelope) (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helmueller, Andrew v. Mclain, Jared
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Mclain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Jacob Helmueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?