Pearson Jr, David et al v. La Crosse County Police Department et al
Plaintiff: David Anthony Pearson Jr and Rory Deer
Defendant: La Crosse County and La Crosse County Police Department
Case Number: 3:2021cv00381
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 3.02 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 8/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 07/29/2021. (aom),(ps)
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiffs David Anthony Pearson Jr. (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation, #2 Envelope) (aom),(ps)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on ifp request: (Financial Affidavit due 7/30/2021.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/7/2021. (jef),(ps)
July 1, 2021 Filing 7 Letter from plaintiff David Pearson regarding trust fund account statement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
June 16, 2021 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #5 Order on ifp request - Initial Order on ifp. Mail re-sent to David Anthony Pearson, Jr. at the address listed on the dkt. #1 complaint. (Plaintiff Pearson has been released.) (kmd),(ps) Modified on 6/18/2021 (jef).
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Plaintiff David Pearson submit a Trust Fund Account Statement by 6/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 06/08/2021. (aom),(ps)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Plaintiff Rory Deer submit $402 filing fee or Motion for IFP w/ Trust Fund Account Statement by 6/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 06/08/2021. (aom),(ps)
June 8, 2021 Filing 3 Letter from Clerk's Office to Plaintiff Rory Deer regarding unsigned #1 complaint. (aom),(ps)
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff David Anthony Pearson Jr. (aom),(ps)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Rory Deer, David Anthony Pearson Jr. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearson Jr, David et al v. La Crosse County Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Anthony Pearson Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rory Deer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Crosse County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Crosse County Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?