Baysal, Alp v. Midvale Indemnity Company et al
Plaintiff: Alp Baysal
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. and Midvale Indemnity Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00394
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2021 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Brief in Support of #25 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., Midvale Indemnity Company (Scarborough, Theodore)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendants American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., Midvale Indemnity Company. Brief in Opposition due 8/30/2021. Brief in Reply due 9/9/2021. (Scarborough, Theodore)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. and Midvale Indemnity Company answer due 8/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/3/2021. (jls)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., Midvale Indemnity Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Zylstra, Sarah)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #21 Motion to Admit Stephen McInerney Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/2/2021. (lak)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Motion to Admit Stephen McInerney Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2912754.) by Defendants American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., Midvale Indemnity Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (McInerney, Stephen)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #19 Motion to Admit Joan E. Hayner Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/30/2021. (lak)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Motion to Admit Joan E Hayner Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2912061.) by Defendants American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., Midvale Indemnity Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Hayner, Joan)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #16 Motion to Admit Christopher M. Assise Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/26/2021. (lak)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Notice of Appearance filed by Theodore Robert Scarborough, Jr for Defendants American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., Midvale Indemnity Company. (Scarborough, Theodore)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Motion to Admit Christopher M. Assise Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2909879.) by Defendants American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., Midvale Indemnity Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Assise, Christopher)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #13 Motion to Admit Patricia Camille Guerra Pro Hac Vice; granting #14 Motion to Admit Gayle M. Blatt Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/16/2021. (lak)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Motion to Admit Gayle M. Blatt Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2906086.) by Plaintiff Alp Baysal. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Blatt, Gayle)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Motion to Admit Patricia Camille Guerra Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2906085.) by Plaintiff Alp Baysal. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Guerra, Patricia)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge update in case. Case randomly reassigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Zylstra, Sarah)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Midvale Indemnity Company. (Zylstra, Sarah)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.and Midvale Indemnity Company answer due 8/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/1/2021. (jls)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., Midvale Indemnity Company. (Zylstra, Sarah)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Sarah Anne Zylstra for Defendants American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., Midvale Indemnity Company. (Zylstra, Sarah)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #5 Motion to Admit Kate Baxter-Kauf Pro Hac Vice; granting #6 Motion to Admit Karen Hanson Riebel Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/22/2021. (lak)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Motion to Admit Karen Hanson Riebel Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2892939.) by Plaintiff Alp Baysal. (Riebel, Karen)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Motion to Admit Kate Baxter-Kauf Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2892936.) by Plaintiff Alp Baysal. (Baxter-Kauf, Kate)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed. Midvale Indemnity Company served on 6/16/2021, answer due 7/7/2021. (Asp, David)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed. American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. served on 6/16/2021, answer due 7/7/2021. (Asp, David)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., and Midvale Indemnity Company. (jls)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jls)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., Midvale Indemnity Company. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2890957.), filed by Alp Baysal. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons American Family, #3 Summons Midvale Indemnity) (Asp, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baysal, Alp v. Midvale Indemnity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alp Baysal
Represented By: David Asp
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Kate Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: Patricia Camille Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Represented By: Sarah Anne Zylstra
Represented By: Theodore Robert Scarborough, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher M. Assise
Represented By: Joan E Hayner
Represented By: Stephen McInerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midvale Indemnity Company
Represented By: Sarah Anne Zylstra
Represented By: Theodore Robert Scarborough, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher M. Assise
Represented By: Joan E Hayner
Represented By: Stephen McInerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?