Kundert, Daniel v. Wellpath et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Kundert
Defendant: Wellpath, Dane County and Dane County Sheriffs Office
Case Number: 3:2021cv00489
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Filing 24 Brief opposing dismissal by Plaintiff Daniel Kundert. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
September 3, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Defendant Wellpath. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Wiesner, Ryan),(ps)
September 2, 2021 Filing 22 Certificate of Service by Defendant Dane County Sheriffs Office as to #21 Answer to Amended Complaint. (Bitar, Remzy),(ps)
September 2, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to Amended Complaint and any Cross Claims by Defendant Dane County Sheriffs Office. (Bitar, Remzy),(ps)
August 30, 2021 Filing 20 Notice of Change of Address by Ryan M. Wiesner (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Wiesner, Ryan),(ps)
August 26, 2021 Filing 19 Motion to Conduct Conference of the Parties; Planning for Discovery by Plaintiff Daniel Kundert. (kmd),(ps)
August 26, 2021 Filing 18 Affidavit of Plaintiff Daniel J. Kundert. (kmd),(ps)
August 26, 2021 Filing 17 Answer to Defendant's Counterclaim, Reply to Defendant's Answer, and Plaintiff's Cross Claim - Wellpath - filed by Plaintiff Daniel Kundert. (kmd),(ps)
August 26, 2021 Filing 16 Answer to Defendant's Counterclaim, Reply to Defendant's Answer, and Plaintiff's Cross Claim - Dane County - filed by Plaintiff Daniel Kundert. (kmd),(ps)
August 26, 2021 Filing 15 Letter from plaintiff Daniel J. Kundert regarding situation at the facility due to COVID. (kmd),(ps)
August 26, 2021 Filing 14 Proposed Amended Complaint filed by Daniel Kundert. (kmd),(ps)
August 26, 2021 Filing 13 Motion to Amend #1 Complaint - Notice of Removal by Plaintiff Daniel Kundert. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (kmd),(ps)
August 18, 2021 Filing 12 Mail re-sent to David Kundert at Stanley Correctional Institution, with added prisoner ID # re: Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #6 E-Filing Notice, and Judge Update notice. (jef),(ps) Modified docket text, plaintiff has a new address per the Wis. Dept. of Corrections website. (jef).
August 11, 2021 Filing 11 Record from Dane County Circuit Court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (lam),(ps)
August 6, 2021 Screening of Complaint pursuant to Prison Litigation Reform Act. (lam/jef),(ps)
August 5, 2021 Filing 10 Certificate of Service by Defendant Dane County Sheriffs Office as to #9 Answer, #7 Notice of Appearance, #8 Notice of Appearance. (Bitar, Remzy),(ps)
August 5, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Dane County Sheriffs Office. (Bitar, Remzy),(ps)
August 5, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Remzy Bitar for Defendant Dane County Sheriffs Office. (Bitar, Remzy),(ps)
August 5, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Lucas Charles Logic for Defendant Dane County Sheriffs Office. (Logic, Lucas),(ps)
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (lam),(ps)
August 5, 2021 Judge update in case. Case now assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lam),(ps)
August 3, 2021 Filing 5 Certificate of Service by Defendant Wellpath as to #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Notice of Appearance, #4 Answer, #2 Declaration. (Wiesner, Ryan)
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Wellpath. (Wiesner, Ryan)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Ryan M. Wiesner for Defendant Wellpath. (Wiesner, Ryan)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 Declaration of Ryan M. Wiesner re #1 Notice of Removal, (Wiesner, Ryan)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dane County Circuit Court, case number 2021cv1378. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2915214), filed by Wellpath. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint and Attachments, #2 State Court Summons, #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wiesner, Ryan) Modified on 8/4/2021. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kundert, Daniel v. Wellpath et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Kundert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath
Represented By: Ryan M. Wiesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane County Sheriffs Office
Represented By: Remzy Bitar
Represented By: Lucas Charles Logic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?