Mestek, Teressa v. Taylor, Louis et al
Plaintiff: Teressa Mestek
Defendant: Louis Taylor, Lac Courte Oreilles Community Health Center, Jacqueline Bae, Shannon Starr, Sarah Klecan, David Franz and Michael Popp
Case Number: 3:2021cv00541
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3730
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Lorenzo Gudino for Defendants Jacqueline Bae, David Franz, Sarah Klecan, Lac Courte Oreilles Community Health Center, Michael Popp, Shannon Starr, Louis Taylor. (Gudino, Lorenzo)
October 12, 2021 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Shannon Starr. Shannon Starr waiver sent on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Schinner, Paul)
October 12, 2021 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Sarah Klecan. Sarah Klecan waiver sent on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Schinner, Paul)
October 12, 2021 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Michael Popp. Michael Popp waiver sent on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Schinner, Paul)
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Lac Courte Oreilles Community Health Center. Lac Courte Oreilles Community Health Center waiver sent on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Schinner, Paul)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Louis Taylor. Louis Taylor waiver sent on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Schinner, Paul)
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Jacqueline Bae. Jacqueline Bae waiver sent on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Schinner, Paul)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant David Franz. David Franz waiver sent on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Schinner, Paul)
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew Adams, III for Defendants Jacqueline Bae, David Franz, Sarah Klecan, Lac Courte Oreilles Community Health Center, Michael Popp, Shannon Starr, Louis Taylor. (Adams, Andrew)
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jacqueline Bae, David Franz, Sarah Klecan, Lac Courte Oreilles Community Health Center, Michael Popp, Shannon Starr, Louis Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Summons Lac Courte Oreilles Community Health Center, #2 Summons Jacqueline Bae, #3 Summons Shannon Starr, #4 Summons Sarah Klecan, #5 Summons David Franz, #6 Summons Michael Popp) (voc)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #2 Motion to Admit Mickey Gale Harrison Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/25/2021. (lak)
August 25, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
August 25, 2021 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 Motion to Admit Mickey Gale Harrison Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2925204.) by Plaintiff Teressa Mestek. (Harrison, Mickey)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jacqueline Bae, David Franz, Sarah Klecan, Lac Courte Oreilles Community Health Center, Michael Popp, Shannon Starr, Louis Taylor. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2924956.), filed by Teressa Mestek. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons David Franz, #3 Summons Jacqueline Bae, Ph.D., #4 Summons Lac Courte Oreilles Community Health Center, #5 Summons Louis Taylor, #6 Summons Michael Popp, #7 Summons Sarah Klecan, #8 Summons Shannon Starr, M.D.) (Schinner, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mestek, Teressa v. Taylor, Louis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teressa Mestek
Represented By: Mickey Gale Harrison
Represented By: Paul Schinner
Represented By: Nola Hitchcock Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Taylor
Represented By: Andrew Adams, III
Represented By: Lorenzo Gudino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lac Courte Oreilles Community Health Center
Represented By: Andrew Adams, III
Represented By: Lorenzo Gudino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Bae
Represented By: Andrew Adams, III
Represented By: Lorenzo Gudino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Starr
Represented By: Andrew Adams, III
Represented By: Lorenzo Gudino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Klecan
Represented By: Andrew Adams, III
Represented By: Lorenzo Gudino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Franz
Represented By: Andrew Adams, III
Represented By: Lorenzo Gudino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Popp
Represented By: Andrew Adams, III
Represented By: Lorenzo Gudino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?