Caso, Chad v. Olson, Tyrone et al
Plaintiff: Chad Caso
Defendant: Tyrone Olson, Edgardo Casillas and Jorge Casillas
Case Number: 3:2021cv00550
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Jorge Casillas. Jorge Casillas waiver sent on 8/30/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. (Galster, Garet)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Edgardo Casillas. Edgardo Casillas waiver sent on 8/30/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. (Galster, Garet)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Edgardo Casillas, Jorge Casillas, Tyrone Olson. (kwf)
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 Report on Filing of Copyright Action. Copy mailed to Copyright Office. (kwf)
August 30, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
August 30, 2021 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2927275.), filed by Chad Caso. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Corona Hornet Registration, #3 Exhibit B - Zombie and Kitten Registration, #4 Exhibit C - Round Logo Registration, #5 Report on Filing Copyright Action, #6 Summons as to Casillas, Edgardo, #7 Summons as to Casillas, Jorge, #8 Summons as to Olson, Tyrone) (Galster, Garet) Modified on 8/30/2021: Summonses are captioned for the Eastern District of Wisconsin. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caso, Chad v. Olson, Tyrone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Caso
Represented By: Garet K. Galster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyrone Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgardo Casillas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Casillas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?